META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Dennis East International, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08165 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 12, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Dennis East International, LLC
221 Willow Street
Yarmouth Port, MA 02675 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.)
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Wed 12/12 8:23 AM
Disposition of Adversary META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) v. Dennis East International, LLC CASE DISMISSED on 12/11/18 . (nmw) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 12/12 8:23 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) v. Dennis East International, LLC CASE DISMISSED on 12/11/18 . (nmw) |
||
Tuesday, December 11, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 12/11 4:33 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Related Doc #6 ). The motion is granted and this adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 12/11 10:58 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 10/04 1:43 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jason M Bergeron on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.). (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 09/25 4:03 PM
Summons Service Executed on Dennis East International, LLC 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Fri 09/14 2:53 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08165 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7658797, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Thu 09/13 4:01 PM
Summons Issued on Dennis East International, LLC Date Issued 9/13/2018, Answer Due 10/13/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/13 3:53 PM
Adversary case 18-08165 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) against Dennis East International, LLC. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.).Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |