META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Coffee Masters, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08169 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 19, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Coffee Masters, Inc.
7606 Industrial Ct.
Spring Grove, IL 60081 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.)
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 19, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
court
Entry
Tue 03/19 1:53 PM
US District Court case number is 8:19-mc-00080-UNA . (nmw) |
|
9 | 9
appeal
Transmittal of Record to District Court
Tue 03/19 12:54 PM
Transmittal of Record to District Court . (nmw) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 03/19 2:23 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) v. Coffee Masters, Inc. DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered on 3/4/19 . (nmw) |
||
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
order
Default Judgment
Mon 03/04 2:05 PM
Default Judgment . ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT: The Motion is GRANTED as set forth herein. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant: (i) in the amount of $45,935.00, which amount includes filing fees of $350.00; and (ii) pursuant to sections 502(d) and (j) of the Bankruptcy Code, disallowing in full and expunging all claims held by or filed on behalf of the Defendant against any of the Debtors in the above-captioned cases. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (See PDF) (law) |
|
7 | 7
order
Default Judgment
Mon 03/04 2:03 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) . The motion for default judgment is granted. Separate default judgment to be entered. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text only order) (law) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 03/04 11:06 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 10/18 6:22 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Olivia Snider on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.). (Snider, Olivia) |
|
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 09/25 3:47 PM
Summons Service Executed on Coffee Masters, Inc. 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Fri 09/14 2:53 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08169 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7658797, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Thu 09/13 4:18 PM
Summons Issued on Coffee Masters, Inc. Date Issued 9/13/2018, Answer Due 10/13/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/13 4:11 PM
Adversary case 18-08169 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) against Coffee Masters, Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.).Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |