META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Intimo Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08170 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 15, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Intimo Inc.
143 W. 29th Street
New York, NY 10001 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.)
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, August 15, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 08/15 8:05 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Intimo Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 8/14/19 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, August 14, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Wed 08/14 3:20 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case . Pursuant to the Joint Stipulation at filing #13 , this adversary case is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation
Wed 08/14 9:03 AM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) and Intimo Inc. Re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Jason M Bergeron on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.). (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 01/30 11:22 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Intimo Inc. (Eggert, Devon) |
|
Wednesday, January 23, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation
Wed 01/23 12:50 PM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) and Intimo Inc. Re: Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint Filed by Jason M Bergeron on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.). (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
utility
Update Answer Deadline
Wed 01/23 1:30 PM
Intimo Inc. Answer Deadline Reset for 1/30/2019 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Mediation Referral
Wed 01/16 11:49 AM
Notice of Mediation Referral. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order Granting
Fri 12/28 2:37 PM
Order Approving |
|
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation
Fri 12/28 9:01 AM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) and Intimo Inc. Re: Extending Time to Respond to Complaint Filed by Jason M Bergeron on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.). (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
utility
Update Answer Deadline
Fri 12/28 9:42 AM
Intimo Inc. Answer Deadline Reset for 1/15/2019 . (nmw) |
||
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Administrative Order Text Only
Mon 12/03 10:48 AM
Order APPROVING . The Stipulation is Approved and is binding on the parties. Pursuant to the terms of the stipulation, the deadline for Defendant Intimo Inc. to respond to the Complaint is extended to December 31, 2018. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text Only Order) (law) |
|
utility
Update Answer Deadline
Mon 12/03 10:48 AM
Intimo Inc. Answer Deadline Reset for 12/31/2018 . (law) |
||
Friday, November 30, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation
Fri 11/30 4:05 PM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) and Defendant Re: Extending Time to Resond to Complaint Filed by Jason M Bergeron on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.). (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 10/04 1:51 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jason M Bergeron on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.). (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 09/25 3:44 PM
Summons Service Executed on Intimo Inc. 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Fri 09/14 2:53 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08170 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7658797, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Thu 09/13 4:19 PM
Summons Issued on Intimo Inc. Date Issued 9/13/2018, Answer Due 10/13/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/13 4:15 PM
Adversary case 18-08170 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) against Intimo Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.).Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |