META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Best Brands Consumer Products, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08177 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 30, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Best Brands Consumer Products, Inc.
20 W 33rd Street, 5th Floor
New York, NY 10001 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 1:08 PM CDT |
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 01/30 3:05 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. . The motion to dismiss is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (law) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 01/30 12:11 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Wed 01/30 4:02 PM
Disposition of Adversary META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Best Brands Consumer Products, Inc. CASE DISMISSED 1/30/19 . (nmw) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 01/30 4:03 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Best Brands Consumer Products, Inc. CASE DISMISSED 1/30/19 . (nmw) |
||
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Administrative Order Text Only
Mon 12/03 10:51 AM
Order APPROVING . The Stipulation is Approved and is binding on the parties. Pursuant to the terms of the stipulation, the deadline for Defendant Best Brands Consumer Products, Inc. to respond to the Complaint is extended to December 31, 2018. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text Only Order) (law) |
|
utility
Update Answer Deadline
Mon 12/03 10:52 AM
Best Brands Consumer Products, Inc. Answer Deadline Reset for 12/31/2018 . (law) |
||
Friday, November 30, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation
Fri 11/30 4:08 PM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. and Defendant Re: Extending Time to Respond to Complaint Filed by Jason M Bergeron on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 10/04 2:09 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jason M Bergeron on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 10/03 7:24 PM
Summons Service Executed on Best Brands Consumer Products, Inc. 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Fri 09/14 2:53 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08177 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7658797, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Fri 09/14 8:11 AM
Summons Issued on Best Brands Consumer Products, Inc. Date Issued 9/14/2018, Answer Due 10/14/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/14 8:03 AM
Adversary case 18-08177 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Best Brands Consumer Products, Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |