META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. 5th Avenue Intimate, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08189 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 10, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
5th Avenue Intimate, Inc.
107 Trumball St., Bldg. F2, Suite 403
Elizabeth, NJ 07206 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 10/10 12:46 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. . The motion to dismiss is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (drs) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 10/10 7:55 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Wed 10/10 1:57 PM
Disposition of Adversary 18-08189 TLS META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. 5th Avenue Intimate, Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 10/10/18 . (nmw) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 10/10 1:58 PM
Adversary Case Closed 18-08189 TLS META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. 5th Avenue Intimate, Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 10/10/18 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 10/03 7:07 PM
Summons Service Executed on 5th Avenue Intimate, Inc. 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Fri 09/14 2:53 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08189 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7658797, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Fri 09/14 9:49 AM
Summons Issued on 5th Avenue Intimate, Inc. Date Issued 9/14/2018, Answer Due 10/14/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/14 9:38 AM
Adversary case 18-08189 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against 5th Avenue Intimate, Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |