META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. International Intimates Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08193 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 24, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
International Intimates Inc.
180 Madison Ave.
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 05/24 8:59 AM
Order Granting Joint Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendant International Intimates Inc. . The motion to dismiss is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (law) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 05/24 8:03 AM
Joint Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendant International Intimates Inc. (Smeall, Aaron) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 05/24 9:02 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. International Intimates Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 5/24/19 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Mediation Referral
Wed 01/16 11:02 AM
Notice of Mediation Referral. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, October 31, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 10/31 9:23 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant International Intimates Inc. (Smeall, Aaron) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 10/31 9:22 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Aaron F. Smeall on behalf of International Intimates Inc.. (Smeall, Aaron) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 10/12 7:40 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Benjamin Michael Katz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 10/03 8:22 PM
Summons Service Executed on International Intimates Inc. 9/14/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Fri 09/14 2:53 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08193 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7658797, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Fri 09/14 10:49 AM
Summons Issued on International Intimates Inc. Date Issued 9/14/2018, Answer Due 10/14/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/14 10:47 AM
Adversary case 18-08193 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against International Intimates Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |