Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Thomas P Barber
Referred: Christopher P Tuite
Case #: 8:18-cv-02279
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2018
Terminated:Sep 10, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2019 5:29 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Mike Clarke
Represented By
Andrew William Justin Dickman
Andrew Dickman, PA
contact info
Kyle Dudek
Henderson, Franklin, Starnes & Holt, PA
contact info
Robert C. Shearman
Henderson, Franklin, Starnes & Holt, PA
contact info
Counter Claimant
Allan Johnson
Represented By
Andrew William Justin Dickman
Andrew Dickman, PA
contact info
Kyle Dudek
Henderson, Franklin, Starnes & Holt, PA
contact info
Robert C. Shearman
Henderson, Franklin, Starnes & Holt, PA
contact info
Counter Claimant
David Wayne Saunders
Represented By
Andrew William Justin Dickman
Andrew Dickman, PA
contact info
Kyle Dudek
Henderson, Franklin, Starnes & Holt, PA
contact info
Robert C. Shearman
Henderson, Franklin, Starnes & Holt, PA
contact info
Counter Claimant
The City of St. Pete Beach
Represented By
Andrew William Justin Dickman
Andrew Dickman, PA
contact info
Kyle Dudek
Henderson, Franklin, Starnes & Holt, PA
contact info
Robert C. Shearman
Henderson, Franklin, Starnes & Holt, PA
contact info
Counter Defendant
Silver Sands Beach and Racquet Club Master Association, Inc.
Represented By
Paul Marcel Crochet
Weber, Crabb & Wein, PA
contact info
Timothy W. Weber
Weber, Crabb & Wein, PA
contact info
Defendant
Mike Clarke
Represented By
Andrew William Justin Dickman
Andrew Dickman, PA
contact info
Kyle Dudek
Henderson, Franklin, Starnes & Holt, PA
contact info
Robert C. Shearman
Henderson, Franklin, Starnes & Holt, PA
contact info
Defendant
Allan Johnson
Represented By
Andrew William Justin Dickman
Andrew Dickman, PA
contact info
Kyle Dudek
Henderson, Franklin, Starnes & Holt, PA
contact info
Robert C. Shearman
Henderson, Franklin, Starnes & Holt, PA
contact info
Defendant
David Wayne Saunders
Represented By
Andrew William Justin Dickman
Andrew Dickman, PA
contact info
Kyle Dudek
Henderson, Franklin, Starnes & Holt, PA
contact info
Robert C. Shearman
Henderson, Franklin, Starnes & Holt, PA
contact info
Defendant
The City of St. Pete Beach
Represented By
Andrew William Justin Dickman
Andrew Dickman, PA
contact info
Kyle Dudek
Henderson, Franklin, Starnes & Holt, PA
contact info
Robert C. Shearman
Henderson, Franklin, Starnes & Holt, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Silver Sands Beach and Racquet Club Master Association, Inc.
Represented By
Paul Marcel Crochet
Weber, Crabb & Wein, PA
contact info
Timothy W. Weber
Weber, Crabb & Wein, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, November 18, 2019
61 61 order Order dismissing case Mon 11/18 5:41 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: Upon due consideration of the joint "Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice" (Doc. # 60 ), this case is dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorney's fees and costs. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 11/18/2019. (ANL)
Related: [-]
60 60 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 11/18 3:53 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Silver Sands Beach and Racquet Club Master Association, Inc. (Weber, Timothy) Modified text on 11/18/2019 (JNB)
Related: [-]