META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Jodhpuri Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08205 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 17, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 13, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Jodhpuri Inc.
260A Walsh Dr.
Parsippany, NJ 07054 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 13, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
appeal
Transmittal of Record to District Court
Wed 05/13 7:54 AM
Transmittal of Record to District Court . (nmw) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 05/13 8:24 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Jodhpuri Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 5/12/20 . (nmw) |
||
Tuesday, May 12, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Tue 05/12 3:48 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case . Pursuant to the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal at Fil. #14, this adversary case is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (law) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation
Tue 05/12 1:05 PM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. and Jodhpuri Inc. Re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Douglas L. Lutz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
13 | 13
appeal
Transmittal of Record to District Court
Tue 05/12 12:55 PM
Transmittal of Record to District Court . (nmw) |
|
12 | 12
order
Administrative Order Text Only
Tue 05/12 12:49 PM
Order Regarding Stipulation . Pursuant to the terms of the Stipulation at Filing #11, the Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment (Fil. #7) and the Default Judgment (Fil. #8) are hereby vacated and set aside. In the stipulation, the parties have advised the court that the parties have fully and finally resolved their dispute. The parties shall file a pleading by May 26, 2020 which establishes that this matter is settled or move for dismissal, and comply with Neb. R. Bankr. P. 9013-1, if applicable. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text Only Order) (law) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation
Tue 05/12 11:23 AM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. and Jodhpuri Inc. Re: to Vacate March 7, 2019 Default Judgment Filed by Douglas L. Lutz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
utility
Reopen AP Case
Tue 05/12 11:42 AM
Adversary Case Reopened. . (nmw) |
||
Monday, March 25, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
court
Entry
Mon 03/25 11:32 AM
USDC case number is 8:19-mc-00103-UNA. . (nmw) |
|
9 | 9
appeal
Transmittal of Record to District Court
Mon 03/25 9:24 AM
Transmittal of Record to District Court . (nmw) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 03/25 11:33 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. , Jodhpuri Inc. DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered on 3/7/19 . (nmw) |
||
Thursday, March 07, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
order
Default Judgment
Thu 03/07 12:10 PM
Default Judgment . ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT: The Motion is GRANTED as set forth herein. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant: (i) in the amount of $33,377.00, which amount includes filing fees of $350.00; and (ii) pursuant to sections 502(d) and (j) of the Bankruptcy Code, disallowing in full and expunging all claims held by or filed on behalf of the Defendant against any of the Debtors in the above-captioned cases, including the Claim. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (See PDF) (law) |
|
7 | 7
order
Default Judgment
Thu 03/07 12:09 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. . The motion for default judgment is granted. Separate default judgment to be entered. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text only order) (law) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 03/06 2:31 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 10/04 3:34 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jason M Bergeron on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 09/24 4:21 PM
Summons Service Executed on Jodhpuri Inc. 9/20/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 09/18 1:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08205 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7662089, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Mon 09/17 10:51 AM
Summons Issued on Jodhpuri Inc. Date Issued 9/17/2018, Answer Due 10/17/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/17 10:39 AM
Adversary case 18-08205 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Jodhpuri Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |