META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Lifeworks Technology Group LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08206 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 17, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 24, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Lifeworks Technology Group LLC
530 7th Ave., 21st Floor
New York, NY 10018 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 1:08 PM CDT |
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Fri 05/24 10:05 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case . IT IS ORDERED pursuant to the Stipulation of the parties at filing #8 , this adversary case is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text Only Order) (law) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation
Fri 05/24 8:46 AM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. and Lifeworks Technology Group LLC Re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by A.J. Webb on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Webb, A.J.) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 05/24 12:21 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Lifeworks Technology Group LLC CASE DISMISSED on 5/24/19 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Mediation Referral
Wed 01/16 11:49 AM
Notice of Mediation Referral. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, October 31, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 10/31 9:25 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Lifeworks Technology Group LLC (Smeall, Aaron) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 10/31 9:25 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Aaron F. Smeall on behalf of Lifeworks Technology Group LLC. (Smeall, Aaron) |
|
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 09/24 4:23 PM
Summons Service Executed on Lifeworks Technology Group LLC 9/20/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 09/18 1:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08206 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7662089, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Mon 09/17 10:53 AM
Summons Issued on Lifeworks Technology Group LLC Date Issued 9/17/2018, Answer Due 10/17/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/17 10:43 AM
Adversary case 18-08206 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Lifeworks Technology Group LLC. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig, A.J. Webb on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |