META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Reliable of Milwaukee a/k/a Reliable Knitting Work
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08215 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 17, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 14, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Reliable of Milwaukee a/k/a Reliable Knitting Works, Inc.
6737 W Washington St.
Milwaukee, WI 53214 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 12/14 10:24 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. . The motion to dismiss is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (law) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 12/14 8:20 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Severini, Erin) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Fri 12/14 11:06 AM
Disposition of Adversary META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Reliable of Milwaukee a/k/a Reliable Knitting Work CASE DISMISSED on 12/14/18 . (nmw) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 12/14 11:07 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Reliable of Milwaukee a/k/a Reliable Knitting Work CASE DISMISSED on 12/14/18 . (nmw) |
||
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 09/25 8:37 AM
Summons Service Executed on Reliable of Milwaukee a/k/a Reliable Knitting Works, Inc. 9/20/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 09/18 1:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08215 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7662089, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Mon 09/17 12:18 PM
Summons Issued on Reliable of Milwaukee a/k/a Reliable Knitting Works, Inc. Date Issued 9/17/2018, Answer Due 10/17/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/17 11:39 AM
Adversary case 18-08215 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Reliable of Milwaukee a/k/a Reliable Knitting Works, Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig, Erin P. Severini on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |