Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael H Watson
Referred: Chelsey M Vascura
Case #: 2:18-cv-01072
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Sep 17, 2018
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2019 4:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Casa Nueva
6 West State Street
Athens, OH 45701
Represented By
Nicholas William Lanphear
Bricker & Eckler LLP
contact info
Jill K Bigler
Bricker & Eckler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Abigail Atkins
40 Highland Drive
Jackson, OH 45640
Represented By
Rachel Sabo
The Friedmann Firm
contact info
Peter Friedmann
The Friedmann Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, June 05, 2019
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 06/05 8:04 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Abigail Atkins (Sabo, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2019
12 12 1 pgs order Order Tue 06/04 4:27 PM
ORDER: If the parties have not filed a dismissal entry in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) ON OR BEFORE JUNE 19, 2019, they are DIRECTED to file a written REPORT detailing the status of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 6/4/2019. (daf)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2019
11 11 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Fri 04/26 1:45 PM
ORDER: Counsel to confer within five (5) business days and inform the Court via e-mail by 5/10/2019 if case should NOT be set for June 2019 Settlement Week. (agm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 03, 2019
10 10 order Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order Thu 01/03 4:31 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The January 9, 2019 preliminary pretrial conference is VACATED. This case is referred to the June 2019 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Joinder of Parties due by 1/18/2019. Motions to Amend due by 1/18/2019. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 1/18/2019. Primary Expert due by 5/24/2019. Rebuttal Expert due by 6/28/2019. Discovery due by 7/19/2019. Dispositive motions due by 8/16/2019. Settlement Demand due by 1/18/2019. Response to Settlement Demand due by 2/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/3/2019. (daf)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 28, 2018
9 9 misc Rule 26(f) Report Fri 12/28 2:52 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT of Parties Pre-Planning Meeting by Plaintiff Abigail Atkins. (Sabo, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 03, 2018
8 8 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 12/03 9:02 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2019 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 30, 2018
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 11/30 1:27 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Casa Nueva. (Bigler, Jill)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/30 1:19 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint filed by Casa Nueva. (Bigler, Jill)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 05, 2018
5 5 misc Stipulation Mon 11/05 4:45 PM
STIPULATION Extension of Time by Defendant Casa Nueva. (Bigler, Jill)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 11/06 8:07 AM
Reset deadlines as to Casa Nueva: Answer due 11/30/2018. (ew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 30, 2018
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 10/30 3:31 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Casa Nueva on 9/17/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Bigler, Jill)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/30 3:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas William Lanphear for Defendant Casa Nueva (Lanphear, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/30 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jill K Bigler for Defendant Casa Nueva (Bigler, Jill)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 17, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/17 8:40 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Casa Nueva ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6602895), filed by Abigail Atkins. (Sabo, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Right to Sue,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet