Bland County, Virginia v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46065 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 17, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Virginia Western, 7:18-cv-00307 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:36 PM EST |
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technology
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technology, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz International GMBH
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Bland County, Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 9:10 PM EDT |
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400.00, receipt# 0423-2926254), filed by Bland County, Virginia.(aab) (Main Document 1 replaced with flatten version on 6/28/2018) (aab).[Transferred from vawd on 9/17/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 ORAL Order Referring Pretrial Non Dispositive Motions to Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. Entered by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 8/15/2018. (bw) [Transferred from vawd on 9/17/2018.] | |
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 70 Day Notice Letter (bw) [Transferred from vawd on 9/17/2018.] | |
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-54), from Northern District of Ohio; MDL No. 2804 (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 9/17/2018.] | |
5 | 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Virginia Western. Case number 7:18-cv-00307. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |