META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Food Equipment Technologies Company
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08227 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 20, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Food Equipment Technologies Company
600 Rose Rd.
Lake Zurich, IL 60047 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 20, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
court
Entry
Wed 03/20 8:24 AM
US District Court case number is 8:19-mc-00082-UNA. . (nmw) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/20 8:28 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Fetco Home Decor, Inc. DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered on 3/4/19 . (nmw) |
||
Tuesday, March 19, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
appeal
Transmittal of Record to District Court
Tue 03/19 12:56 PM
Transmittal of Record to District Court . (nmw) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
order
Default Judgment
Mon 03/04 2:09 PM
Default Judgment . ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT: The Motion is GRANTED as set forth herein. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant: (i) in the amount of $24,127.00, which amount includes filing fees of $350.00; and (ii) pursuant to sections 502(d) and (j) of the Bankruptcy Code, disallowing in full and expunging all claims held by or filed on behalf of the Defendant against any of the Debtors in the above-captioned cases, including the Claim. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (See PDF) (law) |
|
10 | 10
order
Default Judgment
Mon 03/04 2:07 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. . The motion for default judgment is granted. Separate default judgment to be entered. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text only order) (law) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 03/04 11:18 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 10/12 11:11 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Benjamin Michael Katz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 10/04 1:24 PM
Summons Service Executed on Fetco Home Decor, Inc. 10/3/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
court
Alias Summons Issued
Tue 10/02 3:08 PM
Alias Summons Issued on Fetco Home Decor, Inc. Date Issued 10/2/2018, Answer Due 11/1/2018 . (nmw) |
|
5 | 5
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 10/02 2:39 PM
Amended Complaint by Douglas L. Lutz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Food Equipment Technologies Company. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
Sunday, September 30, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Sun 09/30 10:19 AM
Summons Service Executed on Food Equipment Technologies Company 9/21/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 09/18 1:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08227 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7662089, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Tue 09/18 8:08 AM
Summons Issued on Food Equipment Technologies Company Date Issued 9/18/2018, Answer Due 10/18/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/18 7:43 AM
Adversary case 18-08227 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Food Equipment Technologies Company. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |