META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. M. Hidary & Co., Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08236 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 09, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
M. Hidary & Co., Inc.
10 West 33rd St., 9th Floor
New York, NY 10001 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Friday, November 09, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 11/09 11:55 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. . The motion to dismiss is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (law) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 11/09 8:27 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Fri 11/09 11:58 AM
Disposition of Adversary META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. M. Hidary & Co., Inc. CASE DISMISSSED 11/9/18 . (nmw) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 11/09 11:58 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. M. Hidary & Co., Inc. CASE DISMISSSED 11/9/18 . (nmw) |
||
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 10/12 11:16 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Benjamin Michael Katz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
Sunday, September 30, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Sun 09/30 11:01 AM
Summons Service Executed on M. Hidary & Co., Inc. 9/21/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 09/18 1:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08236 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7662089, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Tue 09/18 10:16 AM
Summons Issued on M. Hidary & Co., Inc. Date Issued 9/18/2018, Answer Due 10/18/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/18 9:58 AM
Adversary case 18-08236 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against M. Hidary & Co., Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |