META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. CSS Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08238 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 08, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
CSS Inc.
20 E Clementon Rd., 201-S
Gibbsboro, NJ 08026 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 1:08 PM CDT |
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Mon 04/08 3:50 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case . Pursuant to the Joint Stipulation at filing #19 , this adversary case is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation
Mon 04/08 11:13 AM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. and Closeouts Surplus & Salvage, Inc. Re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by A.J. Webb on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Webb, A.J.) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 04/08 3:56 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Closeouts Surplus & Salvage, Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 4/8/19 . (nmw) |
||
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
Transmittal of Record to District Court
Thu 03/28 2:55 PM
Transmittal of Record to District Court . (nmw) |
|
17 | 17
order
Administrative Order Text Only
Thu 03/28 2:29 PM
Order Regarding Stipulation . Pursuant to the terms of the Stipulation at Filing #15, the Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment (Fil. #10) and the Default Judgment (Fil. #11) are hereby vacated and set aside. In the stipulation, the parties have advised the court that the parties have fully and finally resolved their dispute. The parties shall file a pleading by April 11, 2019 which establishes that this matter is settled or move for dismissal, and comply with Neb. R. Bankr. P. 9013-1, if applicable. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text Only Order) (law) |
|
16 | 16
appeal
Transmittal of Record to District Court
Thu 03/28 12:53 PM
Transmittal of Record to District Court . (nmw) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation
Thu 03/28 9:04 AM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. and Closeouts Surplus & Salvage, Inc. Re: Stipulation to Vacate February 27, 2019 Default Judgment Filed by A.J. Webb on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Webb, A.J.) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
court
Entry
Wed 03/20 11:07 AM
Case reopened as Plaintiff's attorney intends to file a motion to reconsider the Default Judgment. . (nmw) DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED TO REFLECT PLAINTIFF'S AND NOT DEBTOR'S. Modified on 3/20/2019 (nmw) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2019 | ||
utility
Reopen AP Case
Tue 03/19 9:03 AM
Adversary Case Reopened. (nmw) |
||
Friday, March 15, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
court
Entry
Fri 03/15 2:06 PM
US District Court case number is 8:19-mc-00070-UNA. . (nmw) |
|
12 | 12
appeal
Transmittal of Record to District Court
Fri 03/15 10:28 AM
Transmittal of Record to District Court . (nmw) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 03/15 2:10 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Closeouts Surplus & Salvage, Inc. DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered on 2/27/19 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
order
Default Judgment
Wed 02/27 8:29 AM
Default Judgment . ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT: The Motion is GRANTED as set forth herein. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant: (i) in the amount of $22,817.00, which amount includes filing fees of $350.00; and (ii) pursuant to sections 502(d) and (j) of the Bankruptcy Code, disallowing in full and expunging all claims held by or filed on behalf of the Defendant against any of the Debtors in the above-captioned cases. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (See PDF) (law) |
|
10 | 10
order
Default Judgment
Wed 02/27 8:27 AM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. . The motion for default judgment is granted. Separate default judgment to be entered. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text only order) (law) |
|
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 02/25 2:56 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 11/26 1:01 PM
Summons Service Executed on Closeouts Surplus & Salvage, Inc. 10/2/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
court
Deficiency Notice
Tue 10/02 1:42 PM
Deficiency Notice. Deficiency must be cured by 10/16/18 . (nmw) |
|
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 10/02 1:22 PM
Summons Service Executed on Closeouts Surplus & Salvage, Inc. 10/2/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) INCOMPLETE PDF ATTACHED.Modified on 10/2/2018 (nmw) |
|
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
court
Alias Summons Issued
Mon 10/01 2:06 PM
Alias Summons Issued on Closeouts Surplus & Salvage, Inc. Date Issued 10/1/2018, Answer Due 10/31/2018 . (nmw) |
|
Friday, September 28, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 09/28 7:35 AM
Amended Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Douglas L. Lutz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against CSS Inc.. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 09/18 1:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08238 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7662089, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Tue 09/18 10:22 AM
Summons Issued on CSS Inc. Date Issued 9/18/2018, Answer Due 10/18/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/18 10:11 AM
Adversary case 18-08238 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against CSS Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig, A.J. Webb on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |