META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Tara Toy Corp.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08240 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 12, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Tara Toy Corp.
40 Adams Ave.
Hauppauge, NY 11788 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, August 12, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Mon 08/12 3:01 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) . The motion is granted and this adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Mon 08/12 1:43 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 08/12 3:37 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Tara Toy Corp. CASE DISMISSED on 8/12/19 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Mediation Referral
Wed 01/16 11:54 AM
Notice of Mediation Referral. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 10/23 1:05 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Tara Toy Corp. (nmw) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 10/12 11:25 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Benjamin Michael Katz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
Sunday, September 30, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Sun 09/30 11:10 AM
Summons Service Executed on Tara Toy Corp. 9/21/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 09/18 1:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08240 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7662089, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Tue 09/18 10:24 AM
Summons Issued on Tara Toy Corp. Date Issued 9/18/2018, Answer Due 10/18/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/18 10:19 AM
Adversary case 18-08240 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Tara Toy Corp.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |