META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Kizan International, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08246 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 28, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Kizan International, Inc.
100 West Hill Drive
Brisbane, CA 94005 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.)
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Thu 02/28 4:06 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case . IT IS ORDERED pursuant to the Stipulation of the parties at filing #7 , this adversary case is dismissed. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text Only Order) (law) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Thu 02/28 3:21 PM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) and Kizan International, Inc. Re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Erin P. Severini on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.). (Severini, Erin) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Thu 02/28 4:22 PM
Disposition of Adversary META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) v. Kizan International, Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 2/28/19 . (nmw) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 02/28 4:22 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) v. Kizan International, Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 2/28/19 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Mediation Referral
Wed 01/16 11:49 AM
Notice of Mediation Referral. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, November 06, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 11/06 1:07 PM
Answer to Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502 Filed by Defendant Kizan International, Inc. (Carothers, Patrick) |
|
Sunday, September 30, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Sun 09/30 11:38 AM
Summons Service Executed on Kizan International, Inc. 9/21/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 09/18 1:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08246 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7662089, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Tue 09/18 11:13 AM
Summons Issued on Kizan International, Inc. Date Issued 9/18/2018, Answer Due 10/18/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/18 11:03 AM
Adversary case 18-08246 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) against Kizan International, Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig, Erin P. Severini on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.).Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |