META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Northpoint Trading, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08257 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 28, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Northpoint Trading, Inc.
347 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.)
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, June 28, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Fri 06/28 10:40 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case . IT IS ORDERED pursuant to the Stipulation of the parties at filing #8 , this adversary case is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text Only Order) (law) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 06/28 11:20 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Northpoint Trading, Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 6/28/19 . (nmw) |
||
Thursday, June 27, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation
Thu 06/27 3:52 PM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) and Northpoint Trading, Inc. Re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by A.J. Webb on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.). (Webb, A.J.) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Mediation Referral
Wed 01/16 11:49 AM
Notice of Mediation Referral. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, October 31, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 10/31 9:28 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Northpoint Trading, Inc. (Smeall, Aaron) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 10/31 9:28 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Aaron F. Smeall on behalf of Northpoint Trading, Inc.. (Smeall, Aaron) |
|
Sunday, September 30, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Sun 09/30 12:05 PM
Summons Service Executed on Northpoint Trading, Inc. 9/21/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 09/18 1:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08257 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7662089, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Tue 09/18 12:36 PM
Summons Issued on Northpoint Trading, Inc. Date Issued 9/18/2018, Answer Due 10/18/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/18 12:33 PM
Adversary case 18-08257 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) against Northpoint Trading, Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig, A.J. Webb on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.).Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |