META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Advantix Solutions Group Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08258 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 18, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Advantix Solutions Group Inc.
1202 Richardson Drive Suite 200
Richardson, TX 75080 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.)
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 04/18 8:32 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Advantix Solutions Group Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 4/17/19 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Wed 04/17 4:00 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case . IT IS ORDERED pursuant to the Stipulation of the parties at filing #7 , this adversary case is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text Only Order) (law) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Wed 04/17 2:57 PM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) and Advantix Solutions Group Inc. Re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Erin P. Severini on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.). (Severini, Erin) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Mediation Referral
Wed 01/16 11:49 AM
Notice of Mediation Referral. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, November 06, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 11/06 1:15 PM
Answer to Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502 Filed by Defendant Advantix Solutions Group Inc. (Carothers, Patrick) |
|
Sunday, September 30, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Sun 09/30 11:13 AM
Summons Service Executed on Advantix Solutions Group Inc. 9/21/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 09/18 1:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08258 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7662089, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Tue 09/18 12:39 PM
Summons Issued on Advantix Solutions Group Inc. Date Issued 9/18/2018, Answer Due 10/18/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/18 12:37 PM
Adversary case 18-08258 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) against Advantix Solutions Group Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig, Erin P. Severini on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.).Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |