META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Advantus Corp.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08261 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 31, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Advantus Corp.
12276 San Jose Blvd. Bldg. 618
Jacksonville, FL 32223 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.)
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Monday, December 31, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
court
Courts Certificate Of Mailing
Mon 12/31 1:05 PM
Court's Certificate of Mailing . (cde) |
|
8 | 8
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Mon 12/31 12:47 PM
Order to Dismiss Adversary Case . IT IS ORDERED pursuant to the Stipulation of the parties this adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Mon 12/31 12:54 PM
Disposition of Adversary 18-8261 META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate management v. Advantus Corp. CASE DISMISSED ON 12/31/18. (cde) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 12/31 12:59 PM
Adversary Case Closed 18-8261 META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate management v. Advantus Corp. CASE DISMISSED ON 12/31/18. (cde) |
||
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Fri 12/28 2:57 PM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) and Advantus Corp. Re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Jason M Bergeron on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.). (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 10/17 12:27 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jason M Bergeron on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.). (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
order
District Court re: Order Pro Hac Vice
Tue 10/16 4:01 PM
Text only order was entered in Nebraska U.S. District Court Case 8:18-mc-00094-UNA granting a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for attorney Kyle Jacobs (nmw) |
|
Sunday, September 30, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Sun 09/30 11:16 AM
Summons Service Executed on Advantus Corp. 9/21/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 09/18 1:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08261 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7662089, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Tue 09/18 12:53 PM
Summons Issued on Advantus Corp. Date Issued 9/18/2018, Answer Due 10/18/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/18 12:52 PM
Adversary case 18-08261 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) against Advantus Corp.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.).Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |