Loehmann's Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:10-bk-16077
Lead case is: 1:10-bk-16077
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Robert E Gerber |
Case #: | 1:10-bk-16078 |
Case Filed: | Nov 15, 2010 |
Terminated: | Sep 29, 2011 |
Debtor
Loehmann's Inc.
2500 Halsey St
Bronx, NY 10461-3637 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Claims and Noticing Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC, Claims Agent
2335 Alaska Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 22 minutes ago |
Thursday, September 29, 2011 | ||
Case Closed. (White, Greg). | ||
Monday, March 28, 2011 | ||
9 | 9 Order signed on 3/28/2011 Granting Application for Final Decree and Authorizing Closing of Case. (Lopez, Mary) | |
Thursday, March 17, 2011 | ||
8 | 8 Letter witihdrawing motion to lift stay. filed by Deborah Kall Schaal on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Schaal, Deborah) | |
Thursday, March 10, 2011 | ||
7 | 7 Application for Final Decree (Presentment Date: 3/24/11 at 12 Noon, Objections Due: 3/24/11 at 11:00 AM) Application for Final Decrees Closing the Chapter 11 Cases for Affiliated Debtors: (i) Loehmann's, Inc., (ii) Loehmann's Real Estate Holdings, Inc., (iii) Loehmann's Operating Co.; and (iv) Loehmann's Capital Corp. filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Inc.. Responses due by 3/24/2011, with presentment to be held on 3/24/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Oswald, Frank) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Proposed Order Final Decree for Loehmann's, Inc Case No. 10-16078 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2: Proposed Order Final Decree for Loehmann's Real Estate Holdings, Inc. Case No. 10-16080 | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3: Proposed Order Final Decree for Loehmann's Operating Co. Case No. 10-16079 | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4: Proposed Order Final Decree for Loehmann's Capital Corp. Case No. 10-16081 | ||
Att: 5 Pleading Notice of Presentment | ||
Tuesday, March 08, 2011 | ||
6 | 6 Motion for Relief from Stay re: 2010 Mazda CX-9 filed by Deborah Kall Schaal on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.. with hearing to be held on 4/5/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Schaal, Deborah) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Order | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Affidavit of Service | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Contract, Pennsylvania Certificate of Title and NADA Valuation | ||
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay (fee) 10-16078 reg) [motion,185] ( 150.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 7473046. Fee amount 150.00. (U.S. Treasury) | ||
Thursday, December 16, 2010 | ||
5 | 5 Statement of Financial Affairs filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) | |
4 | 4 Schedules filed: Schedule A, Schedule B, Schedule C, Schedule D, Schedule E, Schedule F, Schedule G, Schedule H /Summary of Schedules and Schedules A-H filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) | |
Tuesday, November 16, 2010 | ||
3 | 3 Order signed on 11/15/2010 Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases under Lead Case No. 10-16077 In re: Loehmann's Holdings, Inc. . (Lopez, Mary) | |
Case Joint Administration. An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of Loehmanns Holdings, Inc., Case No. 10-16077 forprocedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in Case No. 10-16077 should be consulted for all matters affecting the above listed case. (Lopez, Mary) | ||
Monday, November 15, 2010 | ||
2 | 2 Motion for Joint Administration /Motion of the Debtors For Order Directing Joint Administration of the Chapter 11 Cases Under Bankruptcy Code Section 302 And Bankruptcy Rule 1015(b) And Waiving Requirements of Bankruptcy Code Section 342(c)(1) And Bankruptcy Rules 1005 and 2002(n) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Corporate Organizational Chart | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Proposed Joint Administration Order | ||
1 | 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered. Chapter 11 Plan due by 3/15/2011, Disclosure Statement due by 3/15/2011, Initial Case Conference due by 12/15/2010, Filed by Frank A. Oswald of Togut, Segal & Segal LLP on behalf of Loehmann's Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) | |
Judge Robert E. Gerber added to the case. (Porter, Minnie). | ||
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 10-16078 [misc,824] (1039.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 185073. Fee amount 1039.00. (Hibbert) |