County of Amador et al v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46075 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 18, 2018 |
Case in other court: | California Eastern, 2:18-cv-02299 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:37 PM EST |
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Thrifty Payless, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
One Johnson & Johnson
New Brunswick, NJ 08933 |
|
Defendant
Kroger Co.
|
|
Defendant
Longs Drugs, Incorporated
|
|
Plaintiff
County of Amador
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
People of the State of California
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:12 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by County of Amador California. Attorney Fiske, John Paul added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7827104)(Fiske, John) [Transferred from caed on 9/18/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Kroger Co., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Thrifty Payless, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Fiske* *Baron & Budd, PC* *603 N. Coast Highway, Suite G* *Solana Beach, California 92075*. [Transferred from caed on 9/18/2018.] | |
3 | 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/11/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. [Transferred from caed on 9/18/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 2 VDRP | ||
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/24/18. This case is REASSIGNED to District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller for all further proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any previous orders issued by the undersigned judge in this case are hereby VACATED and SET ASIDE, and any dates previously set by the undersigned judge in this case are hereby VACATED.(Mena-Sanchez, L) [Transferred from caed on 9/18/2018.] | |
5 | 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 1/17/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Mena-Sanchez, L) [Transferred from caed on 9/18/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Standing Order, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 3 VDRP | ||
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 MDL ORDER. CASE TRANSFERRED to the Northern DIstrict of Ohio.CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J) [Transferred from caed on 9/18/2018.] | |
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Eastern. Case number 2:18-cv-02299. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |