META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Ainsworth Pet Nutrition Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08268 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 19, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 18, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Ainsworth Pet Nutrition Inc.
18746 Mills St.
Meadville, PA 16335 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 01/18 2:16 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary ProceedingFiled by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. . The motion to dismiss is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (law) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 01/18 1:37 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Fri 01/18 2:49 PM
Disposition of Adversary META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Ainsworth Pet Nutrition Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 1/18/19 . (nmw) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 01/18 2:50 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Ainsworth Pet Nutrition Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 1/18/19 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 10/17 1:23 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jason M Bergeron on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 10/04 1:34 PM
Summons Service Executed on Ainsworth Pet Nutrition Inc. 9/24/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Fri 09/21 9:31 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08268 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7666054, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Wed 09/19 8:12 AM
Summons Issued on Ainsworth Pet Nutrition Inc. Date Issued 9/19/2018, Answer Due 10/19/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/19 8:10 AM
Adversary case 18-08268 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Ainsworth Pet Nutrition Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |