COPPA-KNUDSON v. BLACKWRIST GAMING SOLUTIONS LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-50472
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-50472
Nevada Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Bruce T Beesley |
Case #: | 3:18-ap-05014 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Sep 19, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 26, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
BLACKWRIST GAMING SOLUTIONS LLC
ROBERT WILLIS 2764 N. GREEN VALLEY PKWY PMB 239
HENDERSON, NV 89014 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JERI COPPA-KNUDSON
3495 LAKESIDE DR PMB #62
RENO, NV 89509 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:06 PM PDT |
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 10/26 10:36 AM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case (cly) |
|
Thursday, October 25, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Dismissal (case)
Thu 10/25 10:48 AM
Notice of Dismissal with Certificate of Service Filed by JEFFREY L HARTMAN on behalf of JERI COPPA-KNUDSON (HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |
|
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 09/20 11:47 AM
Summons Service Executed on BLACKWRIST GAMING SOLUTIONS LLC 9/20/2018 Filed by JEFFREY L HARTMAN on behalf of JERI COPPA-KNUDSON (HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |
|
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Thu 09/20 11:10 AM
Summons Issued on BLACKWRIST GAMING SOLUTIONS LLC (cly) |
|
4 | 4
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference)
Thu 09/20 11:10 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 12/11/2018 at 09:00 AM at BTB RN-Courtroom 2, Young Bldg.. (cly) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Request to Issue Summons
Wed 09/19 10:45 AM
Request to Issue Summons On: BLACKWRIST GAMING SOLUTIONS LLC. Filed by JEFFREY L HARTMAN on behalf of JERI COPPA-KNUDSON (HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-docket of online payment
Wed 09/19 9:43 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint 18-05014 btb) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 18435673, fee amount $ 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/19 9:41 AM
Adversary case 18-05014 Complaint to Avoid Transfer Filed by JERI COPPA-KNUDSON vs. BLACKWRIST GAMING SOLUTIONS LLC Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)(HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |