META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Talx UCM Services, Inc. d/b/a Talx UCExpress
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08282 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 19, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 13, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Talx UCM Services, Inc. d/b/a Talx UCExpress
1550 Peachtree St.
Atlanta, GA 30309 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 13, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 03/13 3:21 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Related Doc #6 ). The motion to dismiss is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 03/13 11:41 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/13 3:36 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Talx UCM Services, Inc. d/b/a Talx UCExpress CASE DISMISSED on 3/13/19 . (nmw) |
||
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 10/12 2:54 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Benjamin Michael Katz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 10/04 2:24 PM
Summons Service Executed on Talx UCM Services, Inc. d/b/a Talx UCExpress 9/24/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Fri 09/21 9:31 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08282 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7666054, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Wed 09/19 3:28 PM
Summons Issued on Talx UCM Services, Inc. d/b/a Talx UCExpress Date Issued 9/19/2018, Answer Due 10/19/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/19 3:05 PM
Adversary case 18-08282 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Talx UCM Services, Inc. d/b/a Talx UCExpress. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |