META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Trilliant Food Beverage & Nutrition, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08289 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 20, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 20, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Trilliant Food Beverage & Nutrition, LLC
1101 Moasis Dr.
Little Chute, WI 54140 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 20, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 02/20 11:09 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding/Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. . The motion is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (drs) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Wed 02/20 11:24 AM
Disposition of Adversary META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Trilliant Food Beverage & Nutrition, LLC CASE DISMISSED on 2/20/19 . (nmw) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 02/20 11:25 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Trilliant Food Beverage & Nutrition, LLC CASE DISMISSED on 2/20/19 . (nmw) |
||
Monday, February 18, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Mon 02/18 8:19 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 10/17 1:51 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jason M Bergeron on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
Monday, October 08, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 10/08 7:16 PM
Summons Service Executed on Trilliant Food Beverage & Nutrition, LLC 9/24/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Fri 09/21 9:31 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08289 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7666054, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Thu 09/20 9:29 AM
Summons Issued on Trilliant Food Beverage & Nutrition, LLC Date Issued 9/20/2018, Answer Due 10/20/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/20 9:07 AM
Adversary case 18-08289 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Trilliant Food Beverage & Nutrition, LLC. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |