META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Furhaven Pet Products, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08290 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 20, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 22, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Furhaven Pet Products, Inc.
702 Kentucky St., Suite 531
Bellingham, WA 98225 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Thursday, August 22, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 08/22 8:18 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Furhaven Pet Products, Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 8/21/19 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, August 21, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Wed 08/21 4:30 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case . Pursuant to the Joint Stipulation at filing #7 , this adversary case is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Wed 08/21 1:20 PM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. and Furhaven Pet Products, Inc. Re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by A.J. Webb on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Webb, A.J.) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Mediation Referral
Wed 01/16 11:54 AM
Notice of Mediation Referral. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, November 06, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 11/06 1:21 PM
Answer to Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502 Filed by Defendant Furhaven Pet Products, Inc. (Carothers, Patrick) |
|
Monday, October 08, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 10/08 6:59 PM
Summons Service Executed on Furhaven Pet Products, Inc. 9/24/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Fri 09/21 9:31 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08290 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7666054, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Thu 09/20 9:30 AM
Summons Issued on Furhaven Pet Products, Inc. Date Issued 9/20/2018, Answer Due 10/20/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/20 9:11 AM
Adversary case 18-08290 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Furhaven Pet Products, Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig, A.J. Webb on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |