META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Modis Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08294 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 20, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 12, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Modis Inc.
10151 Deerwood Park Blvd.
Jacksonville, FL 32256 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Wed 12/12 8:26 AM
Disposition of Adversary META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Modis Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 12/11/18 . (nmw) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 12/12 8:27 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Modis Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 12/11/18 . (nmw) |
||
Tuesday, December 11, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 12/11 4:28 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) . The motion is granted and this adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 12/11 10:53 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 10/17 1:57 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jason M Bergeron on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Bergeron, Jason) |
|
Monday, October 08, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 10/08 7:10 PM
Summons Service Executed on Modis Inc. 9/24/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Fri 09/21 9:31 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08294 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7666054, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Thu 09/20 9:39 AM
Summons Issued on Modis Inc. Date Issued 9/20/2018, Answer Due 10/20/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/20 9:25 AM
Adversary case 18-08294 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Modis Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |