New Jersey District Court
Judge:Freda L Wolfson
Referred: Douglas E Arpert
Case #: 3:18-cv-14051
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2018
Terminated:Sep 13, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 19, 2019 5:23 AM EDT
Defendant
FRONTIERBPM, INC.
Represented By
PHILIP L. GUARINO
Guarino & Co. Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Notice Only
arbtre
Plaintiff
IT TRAILBLAZERS LLC
Represented By
ROBERT JAMES BASIL
The Basil Law Group, P.C.
contact info

GPO Jul 22 2019
VACATED OPINION GRANTING Plaintiff's 12 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 07/22/2019. (jmh)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, November 04, 2019
43 43 order Stipulation and Order Mon 11/04 11:38 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER vacating35 Order on Partial Summary Judgment (Count II) Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 11/04/2019. (jmh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2019
42 42 misc Stipulation Thu 10/31 11:21 AM
STIPULATION re35 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Vacating Partial Summary Judgment by IT TRAILBLAZERS LLC. (BASIL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2019
41 41 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Fri 09/13 4:19 PM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement.( Administrative Termination deadline set for 11/12/2019). Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/13/2019. (jmm, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 09/13 8:30 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/17/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Mr. Basil is responsible for setting up and initiating the call. (ce3)
Related: [-]
utility Remark (public) Fri 09/13 12:14 PM
ATTENTION COUNSEL: The Telephone Status Conference set for 9/17/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert HAS BEEN CANCELLED. (ce3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2019
40 40 misc Letter Thu 09/12 3:02 PM
Letter from Robert J Basil re Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,34 Scheduling Order,. (BASIL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2019
39 39 respm Letter Rule 7.1 Fri 09/06 3:11 AM
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re37 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment Count I . (GUARINO, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 09/06 8:45 AM
Set Deadlines as to37 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment Count I . Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2019
38 38 service Certificate of Service Tue 09/03 2:54 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by IT TRAILBLAZERS LLC re Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,37 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment Count I (BASIL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 09/03 10:01 AM
Set Deadlines as to37 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment Count I . Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2019
37 37 motion Summary Judgment Fri 08/30 4:49 PM
Second MOTION for Summary Judgment Count I by IT TRAILBLAZERS LLC. Responses due by 10/7/2019(BASIL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Nani Ramanujam,
Att: 2 Exhibit EX A - Court Opinion,
Att: 3 Exhibit EX B - Accounting,
Att: 4 Exhibit EX C - GSA,
Att: 5 Declaration Robert J Basil,
Att: 6 Exhibit EX A Transcript of T. Sak,
Att: 7 Brief Brief in Support of SJ,
Att: 8 Text of Proposed Order Form of Order
Monday, August 19, 2019
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 08/19 2:18 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: The Settlement Conference set for 8/20/2019 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert has been adjourned and rescheduled for 9/18/2019 at 2:00 P.M. Trial Counsel and client representatives with full settlement authority must be present. Please note: The Final Pretrial Conference will be rescheduled, date to be determined after the settlement conference. (ce3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2019
36 36 misc Letter Thu 08/15 4:44 AM
Letter from PHILIP GUARINO re34 Scheduling Order,. (GUARINO, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2019
35 35 11 pgs order Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Mon 07/22 9:57 AM
OPINION GRANTING Plaintiff's12 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 07/22/2019. (jmh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2019
34 34 order Scheduling Order Wed 05/15 4:41 PM
ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 8/20/2019 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Trial Counsel and client representatives with full settlement authority must be present. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2019 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/15/2019. (mps)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2019
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 05/14 2:24 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Conference held on 5/14/2019. (ce3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2019
33 33 1 pgs order Order Fri 05/03 8:16 AM
LETTER ORDER that Defendant's responses to Plaintiff's discovery requests must be served by 5/09/2019. The Telephone Conference will proceed as scheduled on 5/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/02/2019. (jem)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Letter Thu 05/02 8:39 PM
Letter from Robert J Basil re31 Letter. (BASIL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2019
31 31 misc Letter Tue 04/30 9:38 PM
Letter from Robert J Basil re29 Letter. (BASIL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2019
30 30 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 04/08 4:10 PM
LETTER ORDER that the deadline for Fact Discovery due by 6/3/2019; telephone status conference instead of a settlement conference set for 5/14/2019 at 2:00 PM. Settlement Conference reset for 6/4/2019 at 2:00 PM instead of the Final Pretrial Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/8/2019. (mmh)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2019
29 29 misc Letter Fri 04/05 11:09 AM
Letter. (GUARINO, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 22, 2019
28 28 1 pgs order Order Fri 02/22 4:45 PM
ORDER that the deadline to complete fact discovery remains 4/15/2019. Settlement Conference set for 5/14/2019 at 2:00 PM. Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for 6/4/2019 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/22/2019. (km)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 21, 2019
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 02/21 4:20 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Conference held on 2/21/2019. (ce3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 13, 2019
27 27 1 pgs order Order Wed 02/13 4:33 PM
LETTER ORDER that the deadline to complete fact discovery is extended to 4/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/13/2019. (km)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 12, 2019
26 26 misc Letter Tue 02/12 12:04 PM
Letter from Philip Guarino re10 Scheduling Order,. (GUARINO, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 11, 2019
25 25 misc Letter Mon 02/11 11:46 AM
Letter from Robert J Basil re24 Letter. (BASIL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Letter Mon 02/11 11:22 AM
Letter re22 Response in Support of Motion. (GUARINO, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 31, 2019
23 23 respm Statement of Material Fact in Support of Motion Thu 01/31 10:09 AM
STATEMENT of Material Fact in Support filed by IT TRAILBLAZERS LLC re12 Amended MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Count II (only) With E-Signature (BASIL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Document Not Signed by Attorney Thu 01/31 9:05 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Statement of Material Fact in Support of Motion, d.e.21 , submitted by Robert Basil on 1/30/2019 did not contain a proper electronic signature (s/). PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE (s/ Attorney's Name.) This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (km)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 30, 2019
22 22 respm Response in Support of Motion Wed 01/30 9:34 PM
RESPONSE in Support filed by IT TRAILBLAZERS LLC re12 Amended MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Count II (only) (BASIL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
21 21 respm Statement of Material Fact in Support of Motion Wed 01/30 9:33 PM
STATEMENT of Material Fact in Support filed by IT TRAILBLAZERS LLC re12 Amended MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Count II (only) (BASIL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 25, 2019
20 20 1 pgs order Order Fri 01/25 10:08 AM
LETTER ORDER that the pending partial summary judgment motion is adjourned to 2/19/2019. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 1/25/2019. (mmh)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/25 10:09 AM
Reset Deadlines as to12 Amended MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Count II (only) . Motion reset for 2/19/2019 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 23, 2019
19 19 misc Letter Wed 01/23 3:47 PM
Letter from Robert J Basil re12 Amended MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Count II (only) . (BASIL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 22, 2019
18 18 respm Statement of Material Facts in Opposition to Motion Tue 01/22 3:38 PM
STATEMENT of Material Facts in Opposition filed by FRONTIERBPM, INC. re12 Amended MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Count II (only) (GUARINO, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Certification in Opposition to Motion Tue 01/22 3:38 PM
CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by FRONTIERBPM, INC. re12 Amended MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Count II (only) Rule 56(d) Certification of Theodore Sak (GUARINO, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Certification in Opposition to Motion Tue 01/22 3:37 PM
CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by FRONTIERBPM, INC. re12 Amended MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Count II (only) Certification of Theodore Sak(GUARINO, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Sak Certification,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Sak Certification
15 15 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Tue 01/22 3:32 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by FRONTIERBPM, INC. re12 Amended MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Count II (only) (GUARINO, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 09, 2019
qc QC - Incorrect Entry made by Clerk's Office Staff Wed 01/09 11:10 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the Letter Order attached to docket entry14 filed by the Clerk's office on 1/7/2019 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (km)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 08, 2019
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 01/08 9:17 AM
Reset Deadlines as to12 Amended MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Count II (only) . Motion reset for 2/4/2019 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 07, 2019
14 14 1 pgs order Order of Distribution of Funds Tue 01/08 9:25 AM
LETTER ORDER Authoring the release of $1,365.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 1/7/2019. (km)
Related: [-]
13 13 respm Letter Rule 7.1 Mon 01/07 7:35 PM
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re12 Amended MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Count II (only) . (GUARINO, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 28, 2018
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 12/28 9:29 AM
Set Deadlines as to12 Amended MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Count II (only) . Motion set for 1/22/2019 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 27, 2018
12 12 motion Partial Summary Judgment Thu 12/27 6:53 PM
Amended MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Count II (only) by IT TRAILBLAZERS LLC. Responses due by 1/22/2019(BASIL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Brief in support of SJ,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Basil in Support,
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration of Ramanujam in Support,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order Form of Order (Proposed),
Att: 5 Statement Statement of Uncontested Facts
11 11 motion Partial Summary Judgment Thu 12/27 6:01 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Count II (only) by IT TRAILBLAZERS LLC. Responses due by 1/22/2019(BASIL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Brief In Support of Partial SJ,
Att: 2 Declaration Robert J Basil Decl,
Att: 3 Declaration Nani Ramanujam Decl,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order Form of Order (Proposed),
Att: 5 Statement Statement of Uncontested Facts
Thursday, December 06, 2018
10 10 order Scheduling Order Fri 12/07 9:53 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 2/21/2019 at 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Fact Discovery due by 3/1/2019. Any motion to Amend the Pleadings and/or Join New Parties due by 2/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/06/2018. (jem)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 29, 2018
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 11/29 11:42 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/29/2018. (ce3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 01, 2018
9 9 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 11/01 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 11/29/2018 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please do not e-file. Please e-mail this document to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov(ce3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 30, 2018
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/30 3:53 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by FRONTIERBPM, INC..(GUARINO, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 16, 2018
7 7 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Tue 10/16 11:56 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant FrontierBPM, Inc... (GUARINO, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Tue 10/16 9:15 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Application for an Extension of Time under rule 6.1, d.e.6 filed by Philip L. Guarino on 10/15/2018 was submitted incorrectly as a Application/Petition. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Application for the Clerk's Extension USING Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (km)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 10/16 12:23 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by FRONTIERBPM, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/30/2018. (km)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 15, 2018
6 6 misc Application/Petition Mon 10/15 11:47 AM
APPLICATION/PETITION for Local Rule 6.1(b) Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint for by All Defendants. (GUARINO, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/15 11:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by PHILIP L. GUARINO on behalf of FRONTIERBPM, INC. (GUARINO, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 04, 2018
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/04 1:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by IT TRAILBLAZERS LLC. FRONTIERBPM, INC. served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (BASIL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 01, 2018
3 3 service Affidavit of Service Mon 10/01 3:36 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on FrontierBPM, Inc. on 09/25/2018, filed by IT TRAILBLAZERS LLC. (BASIL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 20, 2018
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 09/20 3:22 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to FRONTIERBPM, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/20 10:23 AM
COMPLAINT against FRONTIERBPM, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9036994), filed by IT TRAILBLAZERS LLC.(BASIL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A - Contract,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Statement Rule 7.1 Statement
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 09/20 3:12 PM
Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jmh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Arbitration Thu 09/20 3:17 PM
CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jmh)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Lack of Disclosure Statement Thu 09/20 3:20 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (jmh)
Related: [-]