USA v. Rolle et al
Michigan Western District Court | |
Case #: | 1:18-cr-00199 |
Case Filed: | Sep 19, 2018 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 21, 2018 3:18 AM EDT |
defendant
Michael Marcus Dillard (4)
|
|
defendant
Natia Monique Hudson (5)
|
|
defendant
Fabian Leon Johnson (7)
|
|
defendant
Kendal Adriane Jones (6)
|
|
defendant
Edward Lee Rolle (2)
|
|
defendant
Travis Keion Rolle (1)
|
|
defendant
Dontwan Alan Sanders (3)
|
|
plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
1. | U.S. Secret Service Warns ID Thieves are Abusing USPS's Mail Scanning Service (krebsonsecurity.com) |
Submitted Fri 11/09/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 02/03/2019 9:09 PM EST |
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 24 pgs INDICTMENT as to Travis Keion Rolle, Edward Lee Rolle, Dontwan Alan Sanders, Michael Marcus Dillard, Natia Monique Hudson, Kendal Adriane Jones, Fabian Leon Johnson (ns) Modified text on 9/20/2018 (ns). | |
2 | 2 MOTION and ORDER TO SEAL CASE until defendant is arrested, the investigation is completed, or further order of this court; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (ns) Modified text on 9/20/2018 (ns). | |
3 | 3 PENALTY SHEET re Sealed Indictment1 as to Travis Keion Rolle (ns) Modified text on 9/20/2018 (ns). | |
4 | 4 PENALTY SHEET re Sealed Indictment1 as to Edward Lee Rolle (ns) Modified text on 9/20/2018 (ns). | |
5 | 5 PENALTY SHEET re Sealed Indictment1 as to Dontwan Alan Sanders (ns) Modified text on 9/20/2018 (ns). | |
6 | 6 PENALTY SHEET re Sealed Indictment1 as to Michael Marcus Dillard (ns) Modified text on 9/20/2018 (ns). | |
7 | 7 PENALTY SHEET re Sealed Indictment1 as to Natia Monique Hudson (ns) Modified text on 9/20/2018 (ns). | |
8 | 8 2 pgs PENALTY SHEET re Sealed Indictment1 as to Kendal Adriane Jones (ns) Modified text on 9/20/2018 (ns). | |
9 | 9 PENALTY SHEET re Sealed Indictment1 as to Fabian Leon Johnson Modified on 9/21/2018 (mg). |