Nevada District Court
Judge:Gloria M Navarro
Referred: Cam Ferenbach
Case #: 2:18-cv-01831
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2018
Terminated:Oct 01, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 19, 2019 1:38 AM PDT
Defendant
Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott, LLP
Represented By
Adam Hoeflich
Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott LLP
contact info
J. Randall Jones
Harrison, Kemp & Jones, LLP
contact info
Sean M. Berkowitz
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Defendant
Philip Beck
Represented By
Adam Hoeflich
Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott LLP
contact info
J. Randall Jones
Harrison, Kemp & Jones, LLP
contact info
Sean M. Berkowitz
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Defendant
Hamilton Hill
Represented By
Adam Hoeflich
Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott LLP
contact info
J. Randall Jones
Harrison, Kemp & Jones, LLP
contact info
Sean M. Berkowitz
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Defendant
Christopher Lind
Represented By
Adam Hoeflich
Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott LLP
contact info
J. Randall Jones
Harrison, Kemp & Jones, LLP
contact info
Sean M. Berkowitz
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Defendant
Brian Swanson
Represented By
Adam Hoeflich
Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott LLP
contact info
J. Randall Jones
Harrison, Kemp & Jones, LLP
contact info
Sean M. Berkowitz
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Plaintiff
Kazuo Okada
Represented By
Joel Selik
Chambers & Selik Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/10/2020 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, October 01, 2018
11 11 notice Notice Voluntary Dismissal Mon 10/01 4:21 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Kazuo Okada. (Selik, Joel)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 10/02 7:55 AM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (MMM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 25, 2018
10 10 misc Statement in Removal Case Tue 09/25 5:08 PM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott, LLP, Philip Beck, Hamilton Hill, Christopher Lind, Brian Swanson. (Jones, J.)
Related: [-]
9 9 cmp Petition Removal Amended Tue 09/25 5:05 PM
AMENDED PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court of Nevada, Case Number A-18-780001-P, by Hamilton Hill, Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott, LLP, Christopher Lind, Philip Beck, Brian Swanson. No changes to parties.(Jones, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit N,
Att: 15 Exhibit O,
Att: 16 Exhibit P,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q
Monday, September 24, 2018
8 8 notice Notice Other Mon 09/24 4:10 PM
NOTICE NOTICE OF SERVICE by Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott, LLP, Philip Beck, Hamilton Hill, Christopher Lind, Brian Swanson re6 Minute Order Removal Case,. (Jones, J.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 21, 2018
7 7 notice Notice Desig of Local Counsel & VP Fri 09/21 1:21 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Adam Hoeflich and Sean M. Berkowitz to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/5/2018. (no image attached) (MMM)
Related: [-]
6 6 minord Minute Order Removal Case Fri 09/21 1:18 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/21/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/6/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 20, 2018
5 5 motion Motion Seal Thu 09/20 5:29 PM
MOTION to Seal3 Motion to Stay Case by Defendants Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott, LLP, Philip Beck, Hamilton Hill, Christopher Lind, Brian Swanson. (Jones, J.)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Motion Stay Case Thu 09/20 5:21 PM
MOTION to Stay Case by Defendants Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott, LLP, Philip Beck, Hamilton Hill, Christopher Lind, Brian Swanson. (Jones, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 09/20 5:14 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott, LLP, Philip Beck, Hamilton Hill, Christopher Lind, Brian Swanson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Jones, J.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Thu 09/20 4:43 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court of Nevada, Case Number A-18-780001-P, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5250234) by Hamilton Hill, Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott, LLP, Christopher Lind, Philip Beck, Brian Swanson.(Jones, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit N,
Att: 15 Exhibit O,
Att: 16 Exhibit P
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Fri 09/21 1:14 PM
Case assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MMM)
Related: [-]