Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Amos L Mazzant, III
Case #: 4:18-cv-00662
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2018
Terminated:Oct 24, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 20, 2019 4:13 AM CDT
Defendant
Zodiac Seats US LLC
Represented By
Paul E Hash
Jackson Lewis Pc - Dallas
contact info
Alise Nicole Abel
Jackson Lewis Pc - Dallas
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Asagba
Represented By
Jay D Ellwanger
Ellwanger Law LLP
contact info
Esha Janet Rajendran
Ellwanger Law LLP
contact info
David Warren Henderson
Ellwanger Law, Lllp
contact info


Docket last updated: 29 minutes ago
Thursday, October 24, 2019
24 24 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 10/24 10:05 AM
ORDER. Considering the foregoing Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice and Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above titled action is hereby dismissed with prejudice as to all claims against Defendant Zodiac Seats US LLC. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/24/2019. (baf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2019
23 23 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 10/23 4:59 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joseph Asagba(Ellwanger, Jay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, October 18, 2019
22 22 2 pgs order Order Fri 10/18 10:59 AM
ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS. The Court enters this order sua sponte . Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/18/2019. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2019
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Thu 08/22 3:39 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Leave to Amend the Scheduling Orderto extend the mediation deadline. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/22/2019. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Thu 08/22 3:39 PM
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Mediation Completion due by 8/29/2019. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2019
20 20 motion Amend/Correct Wed 08/21 11:24 AM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct11 Scheduling Order,, by Joseph Asagba.(Ellwanger, Jay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 24, 2019
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Wed 07/24 2:22 PM
NOTICE by Zodiac Seats US LLC Related [+] (Hash, Paul)
Related: [-] turn of Service of Subpoena to Testify at Deposition to Christopher Grissom
Monday, July 15, 2019
18 18 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediator Mon 07/15 12:26 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. The Court hereby ORDERS that this case be submitted to mediation in accordance with this court's Mediation Plan. By agreement of the parties, the mediator assigned is the Hon. Glen M. Ashworth Related [+]. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/15/2019. (rpc, )
Related: [-] t.
Friday, July 12, 2019
17 17 notice Notice of Designation of Mediator Fri 07/12 3:09 PM
NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Hon. Glen M. Ashworth, filed by Joseph Asagba. and Defendant Zodiac Seats US, LLC (Ellwanger, Jay)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2019
16 16 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 04/04 11:25 AM
ANSWER to14 Amended Complaint by Zodiac Seats US LLC.(Hash, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2019
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 03/21 3:41 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Pleading. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/21/2019. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
14 14 12 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Thu 03/21 3:21 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Joseph Asagba.(Ellwanger, Jay)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2019
13 13 motion Leave to File Document Wed 03/20 5:06 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Pleading by Joseph Asagba.(Ellwanger, Jay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, February 22, 2019
12 12 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 02/22 5:54 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Warren Henderson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Henderson, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 20, 2018
11 11 order Scheduling Order Thu 12/20 12:38 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/6/2019 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Amended Pleadings due by 4/8/2019 for Plaintiff and by 4/22/2019 for Defendant. Discovery due by 7/26/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 2/25/2019. Proposed Jury instructions/Form of Verdict due by 11/22/2019 Mediation Completion due by 8/23/2019. Designation of Mediator due by 7/12/2019. Motions to dismiss, motions for summary judgment, or other dispositive motions due by 7/19/2019. Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 11/6/2019. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/20/2018. (baf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 19, 2018
notice Notice (Other) Wed 12/19 8:57 AM
Due to the Court's schedule, the 1/14/2019 Scheduling Conference is CANCELED. The Court will enter a Scheduling Order. (kkc, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 13, 2018
10 10 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 12/13 4:42 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hash, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 12, 2018
9 9 notice Notice of Discovery Disclosure Wed 12/12 10:51 AM
NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Zodiac Seats US LLC (Abel, Alise)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 07, 2018
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 12/07 3:50 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Continue. The Rule 16 Management Conference currently scheduled for January 2, 2019 is rescheduled to Monday, January 14, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/7/2018. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 12/07 3:52 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Rule 16 Management Conference set for 1/14/2019 at 09:30 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 06, 2018
7 7 motion Continue Thu 12/06 7:10 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Management Conference by Joseph Asagba.(Ellwanger, Jay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 14, 2018
6 6 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 11/14 2:32 PM
ANSWER to4 Amended Complaint by Zodiac Seats US LLC.(Hash, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 08, 2018
5 5 10 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 11/08 2:58 PM
ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/13/2018. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 1/2/2019 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/8/2018. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 31, 2018
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 10/31 2:34 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Joseph Asagba.(Ellwanger, Jay)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 29, 2018
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Mon 10/29 11:51 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (rpc, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 26, 2018
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/26 4:59 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Zodiac Seats US LLC.(Hash, Paul)
Related: [-]
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/26 4:21 PM
***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY, SEE 3 . PLEASE DISREGARD*** ANSWER to1 Complaint by Zodiac Seats US LLC.(Hash, Paul) Modified on 10/26/2018 (rpc, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 21, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/21 10:41 AM
COMPLAINT against Zodiac Seats US LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6951744.), filed by Joseph Asagba.(Ellwanger, Jay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 09/21 11:30 AM
Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Fri 09/21 11:30 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (rpc, )
Related: [-]