META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Paris Presents Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08304 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 24, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 05, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Paris Presents Inc.
3800 Swanson Ct.
Gurnee, IL 60031 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Monday, November 05, 2018 | ||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Mon 11/05 8:30 AM
Disposition of Adversary META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Paris Presents Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 11/2/18 . (nmw) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 11/05 8:30 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Paris Presents Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 11/2/18 . (nmw) |
||
Friday, November 02, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 11/02 4:15 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. . The motion to dismiss is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (law) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 11/02 3:55 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 10/09 9:21 AM
Summons Service Executed on Paris Presents Inc. 9/28/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 09/25 4:31 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08304 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7670199, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Mon 09/24 8:32 AM
Summons Issued on Paris Presents Inc. Date Issued 9/24/2018, Answer Due 10/24/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/24 8:01 AM
Adversary case 18-08304 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Paris Presents Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig, A.J. Webb on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |