META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. ICR, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08307 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 24, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 29, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
ICR, LLC
761 Main Ave., Building H
Norwalk, CT 06851 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 01/29 11:13 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. . The motion to dismiss is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (law) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 01/29 9:28 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Webb, A.J.) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Tue 01/29 12:09 PM
Disposition of Adversary META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. ICR, LLC CASE DISMISSED on 1/29/19 . (nmw) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 01/29 12:09 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. ICR, LLC CASE DISMISSED on 1/29/19 . (nmw) |
||
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 10/09 9:08 AM
Summons Service Executed on ICR, LLC 9/28/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 09/25 4:31 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08307 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7670199, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Mon 09/24 8:36 AM
Summons Issued on ICR, LLC Date Issued 9/24/2018, Answer Due 10/24/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/24 8:19 AM
Adversary case 18-08307 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against ICR, LLC. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig, A.J. Webb on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |