META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Marketing Resource Group Inc. d/b/a Toland Home Ga
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08308 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 24, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 21, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Marketing Resource Group Inc. d/b/a Toland Home Garden
273 North Otto St.
Port Townsend, WA 98368 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 21, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Wed 08/21 3:38 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case . IT IS ORDERED pursuant to the Stipulation of the parties at filing #7 , this adversary case is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text Only Order) (law) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Wed 08/21 1:35 PM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. and Marketing Resource Group Inc. d/b/a Toland Home Garden Re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Douglas L. Lutz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 08/21 3:48 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Marketing Resource Group Inc. d/b/a Toland Home Garden CASE DISMISSED on 8/21/19 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Mediation Referral
Wed 01/16 11:54 AM
Notice of Mediation Referral. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 11/20 1:00 PM
Answer to Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuan tto 11 U.S.C. Sections 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502 Filed by Defendant Marketing Resource Group Inc. d/b/a Toland Home Garden (Carothers, Patrick) |
|
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 10/09 9:11 AM
Summons Service Executed on Marketing Resource Group Inc. d/b/a Toland Home Garden 9/28/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 09/25 4:31 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08308 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7670199, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Mon 09/24 12:09 PM
Summons Issued on Marketing Resource Group Inc. d/b/a Toland Home Garden Date Issued 9/24/2018, Answer Due 10/24/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/24 11:16 AM
Adversary case 18-08308 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Marketing Resource Group Inc. d/b/a Toland Home Garden. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig, Erin P. Severini on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |