Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-12276

Wisconsin Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Catherine J Furay
Case #: 3:18-ap-00062
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2018
Terminated:Nov 13, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Stanford L Clacks, Jr.
557 Ronald Lee Circle
Rio, WI 53960
Represented By
Stanford L Clacks, Jr.
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Wisconsin
Department of Workforce Development 201 E Washington Ave. PO Box 8942
Madison, WI 53708
Represented By
Darren J. Magee
State Of Wi - Dwd Unemployment Insurance
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/26/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Tuesday, November 13, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Tue 11/13 2:22 PM
Adversary Case Closed. (Madison, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 27, 2018
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sat 10/27 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/27/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #9 )
Thursday, October 25, 2018
10 10 court Hearing: Canceled Thu 10/25 3:48 PM
Pretrial Conference Canceled re: complaint . Originally scheduled for 11/20/2018 at 02:00 PM . Canceled due to: Stipulation and Judgement have been filed. Related [+]. (Madison, Nicholas)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, October 24, 2018
9 9 orderad Judgment Thu 10/25 2:05 PM
Judgment cc: parties in int. Related [+] Signed on 10/24/2018. (Madison, Nicholas)
Related: [-] 1
8 8 1 pgs order Order Approving Stipulation Thu 10/25 1:35 PM
Order Approving Stipulation re: Non-Dischargeability of Debt. Related [+] cc: parties in int. Signed on 10/24/2018. (Madison, Nicholas)
Related: [-] 5
Tuesday, October 23, 2018
7 7 miscad Proposed Judgment Tue 10/23 9:58 AM
Proposed Judgment Related [+] filed by Attorney Darren J. Magee of State of WI - DWD Unemployment Insurance on behalf of State of Wisconsin . Order to be signed on or after 10/23/2018. (Magee, Darren)
Related: [-] 1 1
6 6 miscad Proposed Order - attorney adversary Tue 10/23 9:57 AM
Proposed Order Related [+] filed by Attorney Darren J. Magee of State of WI - DWD Unemployment Insurance on behalf of State of Wisconsin . Order to be signed on or after 10/23/2018. (Magee, Darren)
Related: [-] 5
5 5 motion Stipulation Tue 10/23 9:55 AM
Stipulation between State of Wisconsin and Stanford L. Clacks, Jr. filed by Darren J. Magee on behalf of State of Wisconsin. Related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff State of Wisconsin. (Magee, Darren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 25, 2018
4 4 miscad Proof of Service Tue 09/25 8:39 AM
Proof of Service filed by Darren J. Magee on behalf of State of Wisconsin. Related document(s)3 ,2 ,1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff State of Wisconsin, Summons Issued, Preliminary Pre-Trial Order. (Magee, Darren)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 24, 2018
3 3 court Preliminary Pretrial Order (auto form) Mon 09/24 2:00 PM
Preliminary Pretrial Order. Signed on 9/24/2018. Related [+]. (Madison, Nicholas)
Related: [-] 1
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto form) Mon 09/24 1:54 PM
Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 11/20/2018 at 02:00 PM at Madison Hearings, Courtroom 350 on complaint . Summons Issued on Stanford L Clacks Jr. Answer Due 10/24/2018. Related [+]. (Madison, Nicholas)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, September 21, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/21 2:24 PM
Adversary case 3 18-00062 Complaint filed by State of Wisconsin against Stanford L Clacks Jr. [ Fee Amount $ 350]. Nature of Suit: 62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud) (Magee, Darren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit (s) Exhibits A-C