City of Eureka et al v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46092 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 24, 2018 |
Case in other court: | California Northern, 1:18-cv-05353 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:39 PM EST |
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Thrifty Payless, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Eureka
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
People of the State of California
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Sep 24 2018
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of Ohio. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018) [Transferred from cand on 9/24/2018.] |
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:21 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., John and Jane Does 1 through 100, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12641365.). Filed byThe People of State of California, City of Eureka.(Farris, Juli) [Transferred from cand on 9/24/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
2 | 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/13/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 9/24/2018.] | |
3 | 3 Proposed Summons. (Farris, Juli) [Transferred from cand on 9/24/2018.] | |
4 | 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2018 02:00 PM in McKinleyville. Parties may participate in the Initial Case Management Conference by telephone and should contact Judge Illman's courtroom deputy for instructions. (msrS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 9/24/2018.] | |
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (msrS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 9/24/2018.] | |
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
Remark: Case file electronically transferred to the Northern District of Ohio. (msrS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 9/24/2018.] | ||
6 | 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of Ohio. (msrS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 9/24/2018.] | |
7 | 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern. Case number 1:18-cv-05353. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |