META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. LSI Corporation dba LSI Staffing
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08317 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 25, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 12, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
LSI Corporation dba LSI Staffing
250 N Kansas St.
Wichita, KS 67214 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, April 12, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 04/12 7:49 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. LSI Corporation dba LSI Staffing CASE DISMISSED on 4/11/19 . (nmw) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Thu 04/11 4:27 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case . Pursuant to the Joint Stipulation at filing #10, this adversary case is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation
Thu 04/11 8:34 AM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. and LSI Corporation d/b/a LSI Staffing Re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Olivia Snider on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Snider, Olivia) |
|
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation
Fri 01/18 3:38 PM
Stipulation Between META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. and LSI Corporation d/b/a LSI Staffing Re: Joint Stipulation to Enter into Mediation and Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Filed by Olivia Snider on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Snider, Olivia) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Mediation Referral
Wed 01/16 11:42 AM
Notice of Mediation Referral. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Monday, December 10, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Mon 12/10 11:15 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by T. Randall Wright on behalf of LSI Corporation dba LSI Staffing. (Wright, T.) |
|
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 12/04 5:07 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Sarah J Applegate on behalf of LSI Corporation dba LSI Staffing. (Applegate, Sarah) |
|
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 10/18 5:33 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Olivia Snider on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Snider, Olivia) |
|
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 10/11 12:13 PM
Summons Service Executed on LSI Corporation dba LSI Staffing 10/1/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 09/25 4:31 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08317 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7670199, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Tue 09/25 8:12 AM
Summons Issued on LSI Corporation dba LSI Staffing Date Issued 9/25/2018, Answer Due 10/25/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/25 7:23 AM
Adversary case 18-08317 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against LSI Corporation dba LSI Staffing. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |