META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. Delta Galil USA Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08319 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 25, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 13, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Delta Galil USA Inc.
11 Harmon Plaza, 5th Floor
Secaucus, NJ 07094 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 13, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 03/13 3:15 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. (f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.) . The motion to dismiss is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 03/13 11:32 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/13 3:38 PM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. v. Delta Galil USA Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 3/13/19 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Mediation Referral
Wed 01/16 11:49 AM
Notice of Mediation Referral. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 10/12 3:45 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Benjamin Michael Katz on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 10/11 12:11 PM
Summons Service Executed on Delta Galil USA Inc. 10/1/2018 . (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 09/25 4:31 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08319 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7670199, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Tue 09/25 8:14 AM
Summons Issued on Delta Galil USA Inc. Date Issued 9/25/2018, Answer Due 10/25/2018 . (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/25 7:31 AM
Adversary case 18-08319 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against Delta Galil USA Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Douglas L. Lutz, Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |