Snail Games USA, Inc. v. Virtual Basement LLC
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dolly M Gee |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-08290 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Sep 25, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 02, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 24, 2019 2:13 AM PDT |
Defendant
Virtual Basement LLC
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Snail Games USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Monday, November 05, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Tue 11/06 10:53 AM
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: In light of Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed on 11/2/201817 , the Court hereby DISMISSES this action without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order, and Order to Show Cause re: Preliminary Injunction6 is DENIED as moot. All scheduled dates and deadline are VACATED. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) |
|
Friday, November 02, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Fri 11/02 11:17 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Snail Games USA, Inc.. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Kuo, Hubert) |
|
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Extension of Time to File
Wed 10/17 11:16 AM
ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATE AND BRIEFING DEADLINES by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's ex parte application to continue the hearing on its motion for a preliminary injunction15 . The Court issues the following rulings: (1) Defendant shall file its opposition or statement of non-opposition by 11/7/2018; (2) Plaintiff may file its optional reply by 11/14/2018; (3) The hearing on Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction6 is CONTINUED to 11/30/2018 at 11:00 AM; and (4) If at any time the parties finalize the terms of their settlement, they shall notify the Court immediately by filing a notice of settlement. (gk) |
|
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 10/15 5:53 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Responses to Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Snail Games USA, Inc.. (Kuo, Hubert) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration In Support, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
11
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Wed 10/10 4:52 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Virtual Basement Ability to Sell Game 6 filed by Plaintiff Snail Games USA, Inc..(Kuo, Hubert) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration In Support | ||
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Thu 10/04 5:32 PM
21-Day Summons Issued re Complaint1 as to Defendant Virtual Basement LLC. (gk) |
|
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines
Wed 10/03 4:55 PM
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND DEFERRING RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court DENIES Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to the extent it seeks a TRO6 and DEFERS ruling on the Ex Parte Application6 insofar as it requests a preliminary injunction. By 10/10/2018, Plaintiff may file a supplemental memorandum and a supplemental declaration in support of its request for a preliminary injunction. Defendant shall file its opposition or statement of non-opposition by 10/17/2018. Plaintiff may file an optional reply by 10/24/2018. The Court shall hear Plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction on 11/9/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. If at any time before the hearing the parties stipulate to maintain the status quo pending arbitration, they shall notify the Court immediately by filing their stipulation. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) |
|
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Summons Request
Tue 10/02 5:09 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Snail Games USA, Inc.. (Kuo, Hubert) |
|
10 | 10
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Tue 10/02 4:27 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION6 by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Because it is unclear from Plaintiff's declaration whether Plaintiff notified Defendant that its opposition is due 24 hours following service of any portion of the moving papers, Defendant is hereby advised that any opposition or notice of non-opposition must be filed by 10:01 a.m. on October 3, 2018. If the parties stipulate to maintain the status quo pending litigation, they shall also notify the Court immediately. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See order for details.) (kti) |
|
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 10/02 12:03 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) |
|
8 | 8
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Tue 10/02 12:02 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE DOLLY M. GEE, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order re Reassignment Pursuant to General Order 16-05 filed on October 2, 2018. (See order for details.) (kti) |
|
7 | 7
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Tue 10/02 10:01 AM
DECLARATION of Peter Kang In Support Of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Virtual Basement Ability to Sell Game 6 filed by Plaintiff Snail Games USA, Inc..(Kuo, Hubert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-7, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Mon 10/01 7:32 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Virtual Basement Ability to Sell Game filed by Plaintiff Snail Games USA, Inc.. (Kuo, Hubert) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum ISO Application for TRO and OSC, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Peter Kang, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Hubert Kuo, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order re TRO, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order re OSC | ||
Friday, September 28, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
cs_rasgn
Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV 89)
Fri 09/28 9:12 AM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-08290 DMG(Ex). (rn) |
|
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 09/26 5:07 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Snail Games USA, Inc.. (Kuo, Hubert) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Wed 09/26 4:47 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 09/26 4:45 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et) |
|
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 09/25 3:38 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22481384 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Snail Games USA, Inc.. (Attorney Hubert H Kuo added to party Snail Games USA, Inc.(pty:pla))(Kuo, Hubert) |
|
Att: 1 45 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit |