New York Southern District Court
Judge:Edgardo Ramos
Case #: 1:18-cv-08776
Nature of Suit120 Contract - Marine
Cause28:1333ad Admiralty
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2018
Terminated:Apr 06, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Mar 24, 2019 5:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Clearlake Shipping Pte Ltd.
Garnishee
Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC
Represented By
Peter Judge Gutowski
Freehill, Hogan & Mahar, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Pan Ocean Co. Ltd.
Represented By
Richard Vaughan Singleton, II
Blank Rome Llp (nyc)
contact info
Alan M. Weigel
Blank Rome Llp (nyc)
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 06, 2020
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Vacate Mon 04/06 12:26 PM
ORDER denying as moot18 Motion to Vacate. On October 17, 2019, interested party Clearlake Chartering USA, Inc. moved this Court to vacate an attachment obtained by the plaintiff. On November 21, 2019, the parties stipulated to the dismissal of this case with prejudice and the release of any attached funds. Accordingly, Clearlake Chartering's motion is DENIED as moot, and the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion, Doc. 18. be Clerk is futher directed to close the case. It is SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/6/2020) (ks)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2019
28 28 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 11/21 6:02 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel of record that the captioned matter be and hereby is discontinued, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), with prejudice, and with each party bearing its own costs. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that the garnishee, Lukoil, is relieved of any further obligations with respect to the attached funds and the full amount of the funds attached by Lukoil shall be released in accordance with the written instructions of Hill Rivkins LLP. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/21/2019) (jca) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Thu 11/21 10:58 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Pan Ocean Co. Ltd.. (Singleton, Richard)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 11/21 10:17 AM
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Pan Ocean Co. Ltd.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). .(Singleton, Richard) Modified on 11/21/2019 (km)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error Thu 11/21 7:18 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Richard Singleton to RE-FILE Document 25 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. Use the event type Other Filings, Proposed Orders, Proposed Stipulation and Order. The stipulation needs to have handwritten signatures of the attorneys. (km)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error Thu 11/21 10:27 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Richard Singleton to RE-FILE Document 26 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. Use the event type Other Filings, Proposed Orders, Proposed Stipulation and Order. (km)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2019
25 25 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 11/20 4:21 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Pan Ocean Co. Ltd.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). .(Singleton, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2019
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 11/08 3:40 PM
ORDER granting23 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/8/2019) (kv)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Extension of Time Fri 11/08 11:45 AM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time with Respect to the Briefing Deadlines for the Motion to Vacate Attachment addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Richard V. Singleton dated 11/8/19. Document filed by Pan Ocean Co. Ltd..(Singleton, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2019
22 22 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 10/31 7:19 PM
ORDER granting21 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re18 MOTION to Vacate Attachment . Responses due by 11/8/2019. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2019
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 10/30 4:05 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Richard V. Singleton dated 10/30/2019. Document filed by Pan Ocean Co. Ltd..(Singleton, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2019
20 20 6 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 10/17 6:01 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:18 MOTION to Vacate Attachment . . Document filed by Clearlake Chartering USA, Inc.. (Saville, James)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Affirmation in Support of Motion Thu 10/17 6:00 PM
AFFIRMATION of Ryan Lynch in Support re:18 MOTION to Vacate Attachment .. Document filed by Clearlake Chartering USA, Inc..(Saville, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
18 18 motion Vacate Thu 10/17 5:59 PM
MOTION to Vacate Attachment . Document filed by Clearlake Chartering USA, Inc.. Return Date set for 11/15/2109 at 10:00 AM.(Saville, James)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Thu 10/17 5:53 PM
NOTICE of Restricted Appearance. Document filed by Clearlake Chartering USA, Inc.. (Saville, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 13, 2018
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/13 5:31 PM
ANSWER to6 Complaint,. Document filed by Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC.(Gutowski, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 11, 2018
minutes Pre-Motion Conference Thu 12/13 6:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Pre-Motion Conference held on 12/11/2018. Plaintiff's counsel present. Counsel for Defendant Clearlake Shipping did not appear. Garnishee's counsel present. Plaintiff is granted leave to serve discovery requests. Lukoil's answer is due Thursday, December 13, 2018. (jar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 06, 2018
15 15 misc Letter Thu 12/06 3:26 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Richard V. Singleton II dated 12/06/2018 re: Response to Lukoil. Document filed by Pan Ocean Co. Ltd..(Singleton, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 05, 2018
14 14 misc Letter Wed 12/05 2:36 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Peter J. Gutowski dated December 5, 2018 re: Responding to Court Order dated December 3, 2018. Document filed by Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC.(Gutowski, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 03, 2018
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Conference Mon 12/03 9:50 AM
ORDER granting9 Letter Motion for Conference: A pre-motion conference in this action will be held on Tuesday, December 11, 2018, at 11:00AM. Garnishee Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC is hereby ORDERED to submit a written response to this letter, not to exceed three pages, by close of business Friday, December 7, 2018. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 12/11/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/3/2018) (jwh)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 12/03 9:51 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 12/7/2018 (jwh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 21, 2018
12 12 service Summons Issued Wed 11/21 11:46 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Clearlake Shipping Pte Ltd.. (dnh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 20, 2018
11 11 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 11/20 11:49 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Clearlake Shipping Pte, Ltd, 12 Marina Boulevard, #35-02, Marina Bay Financial Centre Tower 3, Singapore 018982, re:6 Complaint,. Document filed by Pan Ocean Co. Ltd.. (Singleton, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 19, 2018
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/19 4:23 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Judge Gutowski on behalf of Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC. (Gutowski, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 16, 2018
9 9 motion Conference Fri 11/16 10:13 AM
LETTER MOTION for Conference with the Court to seek leave to file a motion to compel garnishees Lukoil Pan Americas LLC (Lukoil) and Litasco SA (Litasco) to serve answers and written answers to interrogatories under oath. addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Richard V. Singleton dated November 16,2018. Document filed by Pan Ocean Co. Ltd..(Singleton, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 28, 2018
8 8 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 09/28 3:15 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Jeil Holdings Co Ltd., Other Affiliate Harim Group for Pan Ocean Co. Ltd.. Document filed by Pan Ocean Co. Ltd..(Singleton, Richard)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error Fri 09/28 2:16 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Richard Vaughan Singleton to RE-FILE Document 7 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 27, 2018
7 7 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 09/27 11:00 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Jeil Holdings Co Ltd. for Pan Ocean Co. Ltd.. Document filed by Pan Ocean Co. Ltd..(Singleton, Richard)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Complaint Thu 09/27 10:52 AM
COMPLAINT against Clearlake Shipping Pte Ltd.. Document filed by Pan Ocean Co. Ltd..(Singleton, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Complaint.,
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Complaint.,
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Complaint,
Att: 4 Memo Endorsed Letter dated 9/26/18 re: Filing Corrected Complaint with Exhibits.
Wednesday, September 26, 2018
5 5 order Memo Endorsement Wed 09/26 4:17 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:3 Letter filed by Pan Ocean Co. Ltd. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 9/26/2018) (jwh)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Letter Wed 09/26 11:08 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Richard V. Singleton II dated 09/26/2018 re: Corrected Complaint. Document filed by Pan Ocean Co. Ltd..(Singleton, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 25, 2018
4 4 6 pgs order Order Issuing Maritime Attachment and Garnishment Wed 09/26 1:25 PM
ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE PROCESS OF MARITIME ATTACHMENT AND GARNISHMENT AND APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER: ACCORDINGLY, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment shall issue against all tangible or intangible property belonging to or being held for Defendants by any garnishee identified in Schedule A to this Order, upon whom a copy of the Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment may be served, in an amount of up to US $4,475,803.30, pursuant to Rule B of the Supplemental Rules for Certain Admiralty and Maritime Claims of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 9/25/2018) (jwh)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 09/26 9:50 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (laq) (pc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/26 9:47 AM
COMPLAINT against Clearlake Shipping Pte Ltd.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 1218986)Document filed by Pan Ocean Co. Ltd..(laq)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 09/26 9:47 AM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (laq)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 09/26 9:48 AM
Case Designated ECF. (laq)
Related: [-]
order Order Issuing Maritime Attachment and Garnishment Wed 10/24 3:48 PM
MARITIME ATTACHMENT AND GARNISHMENT ISSUED on 9/25/2018 in the amount of $4,475,803.30. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 9/25/2018) (kgo)
Related: [-]