17
|
|
17
2
pgs
notice
CerDocTyp - Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
Sat 11/03 12:28 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript has been filed. Pursuant to the new policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the clerk's office or may be purchased from the court transcriber for a 90 day period. Related [+] (Admin.)
|
16
|
|
16
31
pgs
court
Transcript filed
Tue 10/30 9:15 AM
Transcript filed Re: Hearing Held 10/17/2018, Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 01/28/2019. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber eScribers, Telephone number 973-406-2250.] [Transcript Purchased by D. Margeaux Thomas.] Related [+]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/6/2018. Redaction Request Due By 11/20/2018. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/30/2018. Transcript access will be restricted through 01/28/2019. (Gottlieb, Jason)
|
15
|
|
15
court
BNC certificate of mailing of order
Sun 10/28 12:34 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
|
14
|
|
14
court
Adversary Proceeding Closed
Thu 10/25 2:19 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Muller, Terry)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
4
pgs
order
Remand
Thu 10/25 2:18 PM
Order to Remand Adversary Proceeding to the District Court. Related [+] (Muller, Terry)
|
12
|
|
12
court
Hearing held
Wed 10/17 12:24 PM
Hearing held; Case to be Remanded; Order to be submitted by Mr. Sherman Related [+] Appearances: Jeffrey M. Sherman; Steven Biss. (oliverb)
|
11
|
|
11
answer
Reply
Tue 10/16 3:52 PM
Reply to Opposition Related [+] filed by Jeffrey M. Sherman of Law Offices of Jeffrey M. Sherman on behalf of Jesselyn Radack. (Sherman, Jeffrey)
|
10
|
|
10
answer
Objection
Mon 10/15 8:38 PM
Objection to (Memorandum in Opposition) Related [+] filed by Steven S. Biss of Law Office of Steven S. Biss on behalf of Trevor Fitzgibbon. (Biss, Steven)
|
9
|
|
9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 09/27 1:11 PM
Defendant's Notice of Appearance filed by Diana Margeaux Thomas of Thomas Law Office, PLC on behalf of Jesselyn Radack. (Thomas, Diana)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 09/27 11:19 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Jeffrey M. Sherman of Law Offices of Jeffrey M. Sherman on behalf of Jesselyn Radack. (Sherman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
notice
Amended Notice of Hearing
Thu 09/27 10:59 AM
Amended Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Jeffrey M. Sherman of Law Offices of Jeffrey M. Sherman on behalf of Jesselyn Radack. Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2018 at 11:30 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Sherman, Jeffrey)
|
6
|
|
6
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 09/27 10:47 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Jeffrey M. Sherman of Law Offices of Jeffrey M. Sherman on behalf of Jesselyn Radack. Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2018 at 11:30 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia.(Sherman, Jeffrey)
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit(s) Motion to Transfer Venue
|
5
|
|
5
motion
Transfer Venue
Thu 09/27 10:46 AM
Motion to Transfer Venue to District of Columbia, filed by Jeffrey M. Sherman of Law Offices of Jeffrey M. Sherman on behalf of Jesselyn Radack. Objection(s) due by 10/15/2018. (Sherman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Proposed Order
|
4
|
|
4
misc
Statement
Wed 09/26 1:10 PM
Plaintiff's Statement Regarding Consent filed by Steven S. Biss of Law Office of Steven S. Biss on behalf of Trevor Fitzgibbon. (Biss, Steven)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
misc
Statement
Wed 09/26 11:56 AM
Statement (Jury Trial Demand) filed by Steven S. Biss of Law Office of Steven S. Biss on behalf of Trevor Fitzgibbon. (Biss, Steven)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 09/26 10:51 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Steven S. Biss of Law Office of Steven S. Biss on behalf of Trevor Fitzgibbon. (Biss, Steven)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
3
pgs
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 09/25 1:18 PM
Notice of Removal (Fee Amount of $350 is Exempt ) filed by Trevor Fitzgibbon. Nature of Suit: (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: (Sherman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit(s) Original Summons
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit(s) Second Amended Complaint (Redacted)
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit(s) Answer and Counterclaim
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit(s) Answer to Counterclaim
|