GALLAGHER v. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy J Kelly |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-02154 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 14, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2019 5:05 AM EDT |
Defendant
FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
|
|
Defendant
STEVEN D. HARDEMAN
|
|
Plaintiff
RYAN GALLAGHER
Rev., "Sasha" 1690 Monterey Way
Fountain, CO 80817 |
GPO
Nov 25 2019
MEMORANDUM OPINION in support of 21 Order dismissing action. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/25/2019. (lctjk1) |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, November 25, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
6
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Mon 11/25 5:02 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION in support of21 Order dismissing action. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/25/2019. (lctjk1) |
|
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 11/25 4:59 PM
ORDER dismissing action. See Order for details. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/25/2019. (lctjk1) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 08/08 8:40 AM
MOTION by RYAN GALLAGHER. (tth) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Fri 07/12 1:31 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, STEVEN D. HARDEMAN. (tth) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Thu 06/20 8:15 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State A Claim filed by FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, STEVEN D. HARDEMAN. (Graham-Oliver, Heather) |
|
Thursday, June 13, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Jury Demand
Thu 06/13 3:42 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by RYAN GALLAGHER. "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/13/19. (tth) |
|
16 | 16
respm
Response to Order of the Court
Thu 06/13 3:39 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re13 Fox/Neal Order, filed by RYAN GALLAGHER. (See Docket Entry15 to view document). (tth) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Hearing
Thu 06/13 3:37 PM
MOTION for Hearing by RYAN GALLAGHER. "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/13/19. (tth) |
|
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for CM/ECF Password
Tue 05/14 1:48 PM
ORDER denying Plaintiff's9 Motion for CM/ECF Password. The Clerk's Office is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at the address listed on the docket. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/14/2019. (lctjk1) |
|
13 | 13
order
Fox/Neal Order
Tue 05/14 1:45 PM
Order advising Plaintiff to respond by June 13, 2019, to Defendant's12 Motion to Dismiss or risk dismissal of the case. See Order for details. The Clerk's Office is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at the address listed on the docket. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/14/2019. (lctjk1) |
|
Monday, May 13, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 05/13 8:35 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State A Claim by FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, STEVEN D. HARDEMAN (Graham-Oliver, Heather) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Mon 05/13 4:05 PM
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Heather D. Graham-Oliver on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Marsha Yee (Graham-Oliver, Heather) |
|
Friday, May 10, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 05/10 2:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER treating as opposed and granting, nunc pro tunc, Defendants'10 Second Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's1 Complaint by May 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/10/2019. (lctjk1) |
||
Wednesday, May 08, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to
Wed 05/08 7:24 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, STEVEN D. HARDEMAN(Yee, Marsha) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, May 02, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
motion
CM/ECF Password
Thu 05/02 3:54 PM
MOTION for CM/ECF Password by RYAN GALLAGHER. "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/2/19. (tth) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Thu 05/02 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by RYAN GALLAGHER. "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/2/19. (tth) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 03/18 8:41 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants'7 Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's1 Complaint by May 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/18/2019. (lctjk1) |
||
Thursday, March 14, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to
Thu 03/14 3:55 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, STEVEN D. HARDEMAN(Yee, Marsha) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/14 3:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, STEVEN D. HARDEMAN(Yee, Marsha) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
Wed 01/23 11:32 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/17/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/18/2019.) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/17/2019. (tth) |
|
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 01/17 9:39 AM
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, STEVEN D. HARDEMAN. (zef, ) |
|
Wednesday, November 07, 2018 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 11/07 11:57 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zrdj) |
||
Monday, November 05, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 11/07 11:54 AM
FIAT ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED". Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/23/2018. (zrdj) |
|
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
misc
Receipt of Initiating Pleading & IFP Application
Wed 09/26 7:43 AM
Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 9/14/18. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd) |