Arizona District Court
Judge:Susan R Bolton
Case #: 2:18-cv-03037
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2018
Terminated:Sep 10, 2019
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2019 2:27 AM MST
Defendant
Pro Residential Management Incorporated
Represented By
Judy Drickey-Prohow
Law Office Of Scott Clark Pc - Tucson, Az
contact info
Scott M Clark
Law Offices Of Scott M Clark
contact info
Christopher Russell Walker
Law Office Of Scott M Clark PC
contact info
Paul Alexander Henderson
Law Offices Of Scott M Clark PC
contact info
Colin Lloyd Clark
Law Office Of Scott M Clark PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Christina Near
Represented By
Sean Christopher Davis
Dayes Law Firm
contact info
Trey A R Dayes, III
Dayes Law Firm
contact info
Preston K Flood
Dayes Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 40 minutes ago
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
31 31 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case Tue 09/10 11:04 AM
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - Pursuant to the parties' Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice30 , and good cause appearing,IT IS ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/10/19. (SLQ)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 09/10 6:44 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Christina Near.(Davis, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, August 12, 2019
29 29 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 08/12 6:42 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:25 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Christina Near. (Davis, Sean)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2019
28 28 misc Statement of Facts Fri 07/26 3:29 PM
STATEMENT OF FACTS re:27 Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant Pro Residential Management Incorporated.(Walker, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
27 27 respm Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Fri 07/26 3:21 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:25 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Pro Residential Management Incorporated. (Walker, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2019
26 26 misc Statement of Facts Fri 06/28 7:11 AM
STATEMENT OF FACTS re:25 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Christina Near.(Davis, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
25 25 motion Partial Summary Judgment Fri 06/28 6:54 AM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Christina Near. (Davis, Sean)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2019
24 24 notice Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses Fri 05/24 9:51 AM
NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Christina Near. (Davis, Sean)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2019
23 23 notice Notice of Deposition Fri 05/10 8:30 AM
NOTICE of Deposition of Christina Near, filed by Pro Residential Management Incorporated. (Walker, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2019
22 22 notice Notice of Deposition Mon 05/06 9:05 AM
NOTICE of Deposition of Tonya Pittlekow, filed by Christina Near. (Davis, Sean)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Deposition Mon 05/06 9:04 AM
NOTICE of Deposition of Angelica Medina, filed by Christina Near. (Davis, Sean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2019
20 20 misc Report - Settlement Talks/Discussions Thu 03/14 6:52 AM
REPORT of Settlement Talks/Discussions by Christina Near. (Davis, Sean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
19 19 notice Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery Wed 03/13 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Pro Residential Management Incorporated. (Walker, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
18 18 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 03/12 1:43 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties file their joint report on settlement talks with 7 days from the date of this Order [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 3/12/19. (MAW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2019
17 17 2 pgs notice Notice of Deposition Thu 03/07 1:15 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Miriam Martinez, filed by Christina Near. (Davis, Sean)
Related: [-]
16 16 2 pgs notice Notice of Service of Discovery Thu 03/07 1:15 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Christina Near. (Davis, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 17, 2018
15 15 notice Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery Mon 12/17 10:40 AM
NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Christina Near. (Davis, Sean)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 07, 2018
14 14 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/07 5:15 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pro Residential Management Incorporated. (Henderson, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 06, 2018
13 13 order Scheduling Order Thu 12/06 9:07 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/24/2019. Dispositive motions due by 6/28/2019 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 12/4/18. (MAW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 04, 2018
12 12 minutes Scheduling Conference 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) Tue 12/04 1:58 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Susan R Bolton: Scheduling Conference held on 12/4/2018. Defense counsel addresses the Court regarding his failure to appear in person for today's proceedings. Deadlines discussed and entered. Scheduling Order to follow. A copy of the form of the Joint Proposed Pretrial Order is provided to Plaintiff's counsel this date. APPEARANCES: Sean Davis for Plaintiff. Telephonic appearance by Paul Henderson for Defendant. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams) Hearing held 11:14 AM to 11:28 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12/04 11:04 AM
NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Pro Residential Management Incorporated. (MAW)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 26, 2018
10 10 misc Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP Mon 11/26 3:41 PM
Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Christina Near. (Davis, Sean)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 02, 2018
9 9 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 11/02 11:29 AM
ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Case Management Conference is set for December 4, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 502, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2151 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/2/18. (MAW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 01, 2018
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel Thu 11/01 5:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Alexander Henderson on behalf of Pro Residential Management Incorporated. (Henderson, Paul)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 11/01 5:52 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Pro Residential Management Incorporated.(Henderson, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 26, 2018
6 6 2 pgs order Order re Rule 12(b) Motions Wed 09/26 11:50 AM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/26/18. (MAW)
Related: [-]
5 5 12 pgs notice Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Wed 09/26 11:18 AM
NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs service Summons Issued Wed 09/26 11:17 AM
Summons Issued as to Pro Residential Management Incorporated. (KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs misc New Case Opened Wed 09/26 11:14 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16002218. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R. Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 18-3037 PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs service Summons Submitted Wed 09/26 11:13 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by Christina Near. (Davis, Sean) (KEP)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 09/26 11:12 AM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16002218 filed by Christina Near. (Davis, Sean)(KEP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet