Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Donald M Middlebrooks
Referred: Dave Lee Brannon
Case #: 9:18-cv-81319
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1331 Federal Question
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2018
Terminated:Mar 26, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2019 5:35 AM EDT
Defendant
United American Security, LLC
Represented By
Kevin Douglas Zwetsch
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak, & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Karen Elizabeth Smeda
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak , Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Mediator
Neil Flaxman
Plaintiff
Carlos Muentes
Represented By
Valerie Barton Barnhart
Perera Barnhart
contact info
Waynice Amoii Green
Perera Barnhart, P.A.
contact info
Jorge Freddy Perera
Perera Barnhart
contact info
Brody Max Shulman
Perera Barnhart
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, March 26, 2019
38 38 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Tue 03/26 3:47 PM
ORDER GRANTING APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSING CASE. Granting37 Motion for Settlement. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2019
37 37 motion Settlement Thu 03/21 11:31 AM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval Related [+] by United American Security, LLC. Responses due by 4/4/2019(Zwetsch, Kevin)
Related: [-] newed
Att: 1 Exhibit A - FLSA Settlement Agreement (fully executed),
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 20, 2019
36 36 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Wed 03/20 4:21 PM
ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE JOINT MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF CASE. Denying Without Prejudice35 Motion for Settlement. Motions due by 3/26/2019. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2019
35 35 motion Settlement Mon 03/18 1:37 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval and to Dismiss Action With Prejudice, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by United American Security, LLC. Responses due by 4/1/2019 (Zwetsch, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
34 34 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 03/12 11:12 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting33 Motion for Extension of Time. The Parties shall file all appropriate closing documents on or by March 18, 2019. The deadline by which Defendant must file a response to Plaintiff's Amended Statement of Claim (DE23 ) is also extended to March 18, 2019. The Parties may move the Court to retain jurisdiction upon closing the case if necessary to enforce the terms of their settlement agreement. The Parties are further advised that until closing documents are filed, the court will expect compliance with all litigation deadlines presently set in this case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/12/2019. (sfr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
33 33 motion Extension of Time Mon 03/11 5:51 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit a Motion to Approve the Settlement Agreement re 29 Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, by United American Security, LLC. Responses due by 3/25/2019 (Zwetsch, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
32 32 order ~Util - Terminate Hearings - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 03/06 10:18 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER: In light of Defendant's Notice of Settlement [DE 28], the Court CANCELS the Settlement Conference set for April 1, 2019. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 3/6/2019. (js03)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2019
31 31 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 03/05 10:05 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting30 the Parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline by which the Parties must file all appropriate closing documents is extended to March 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/5/2019. (sfr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2019
30 30 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/04 4:38 PM
Joint MOTION For Enlargement of Time to Submit A Motion To Approve The Settlement Agreement re 29 Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, by United American Security, LLC.(Zwetsch, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, February 22, 2019
29 29 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 02/22 11:55 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER. On February 21, 2019, Defendant notified the Court that the Parties have settled this matter. The Court congratulates the Parties on reaching an amicable resolution of this matter. Pursuant to the Pretrial Scheduling Order (DE10 ), the Parties shall file all appropriate closing documents on or by March 4, 2019. In light of the Parties' settlement, the deadline by which Defendant must file a response to Plaintiff's Amended Statement of Claim (DE23 ) is also extended to March 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/22/2019. (sfr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 21, 2019
28 28 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Thu 02/21 11:46 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by United American Security, LLC (Zwetsch, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 15, 2019
27 27 notice NOTICE of HEARING (or CANCELLATION) Fri 02/15 3:43 PM
Order Scheduling Joint Settlement Conference before U.S. Magistrate Judge set for 4/1/2019 at 10:30 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. (spe)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 02/15 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Karen Elizabeth Smeda on behalf of United American Security, LLC. Attorney Karen Elizabeth Smeda added to party United American Security, LLC(pty:dft). (Smeda, Karen)
Related: [-]
25 25 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 02/15 2:48 PM
ORDER REFERRING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE. Granting:22 Joint MOTION to Schedule Settlement Conference with United States Magistrate Judge re9 Scheduling Order, filed by United American Security, LLC. ( Mediation Deadline Extended To 4/12/2019.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 14, 2019
24 24 misc Report Regarding Thu 02/14 12:18 PM
REPORT REGARDING Settlement by Carlos Muentes (Green, Waynice)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 13, 2019
23 23 misc Statement Wed 02/13 2:41 PM
Statement of: Claim (Amended) by Carlos Muentes (Green, Waynice)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 02/13 1:45 PM
Joint MOTION to Schedule Settlement Conference with United States Magistrate Judge re9 Scheduling Order, by United American Security, LLC. (Zwetsch, Kevin)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 02/13 1:13 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brody Max Shulman on behalf of Carlos Muentes. Attorney Brody Max Shulman added to party Carlos Muentes(pty:pla). (Shulman, Brody)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 22, 2019
20 20 respm Response/Reply (Other) Tue 01/22 2:55 PM
RESPONSE to13 Statement of Claim by United American Security, LLC. (Zwetsch, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 14, 2019
19 19 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 01/14 4:35 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting18 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file any response to Plaintiff's Statement of Claim (DE13 ) on or by January 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 1/14/2019. (kal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 10, 2019
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Thu 01/10 2:12 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to13 Statement of Claim by United American Security, LLC.(Zwetsch, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, December 21, 2018
17 17 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 12/21 11:07 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting16 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline by which Defendant United American Security, LLC must file its response to Plaintiff's Statement of Claim (DE13 ) is extended to January 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 12/21/2018. (kal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 19, 2018
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 12/19 8:56 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to13 Statement,12 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - Chambers and Clerks by United American Security, LLC.(Zwetsch, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, December 17, 2018
15 15 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Mon 12/17 6:02 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added Neil Flaxman. (Barnhart, Valerie)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Mon 12/17 2:48 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Carlos Muentes (Barnhart, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 14, 2018
13 13 misc Statement Fri 12/14 2:37 PM
Statement of: Claim by Carlos Muentes (Green, Waynice)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 04, 2018
12 12 notice Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - Chambers and Clerks Tue 12/04 10:23 AM
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re9 Scheduling Order. Wrong Document Attached. Correction : The correct document has been attached to this notice. (cds)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 03, 2018
11 11 utility Case Referred to Mediation Tue 12/04 9:40 AM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation per DE#10 order. (cds)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Mon 12/03 3:45 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDERAND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. ( Amended Pleadings due by 12/17/2018., Discovery due by 3/4/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 12/17/2018., Motions due by 3/18/2019., Pretrial Stipulation due by 4/29/2019., Calendar Call set for 5/22/2019 before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Jury Trial set for 5/28/2019 before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. ), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 12/3/2018. See attached document for full details. (cds)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Scheduling Order Mon 12/03 3:09 PM
ORDER SETTING FLSA SCHEDULE. Plaintiff shall file Statement of Claim due by or before 12/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 12/3/2018. See attached document for full details. (cds)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/03 1:26 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by United American Security, LLC. (Zwetsch, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 29, 2018
7 7 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 11/29 2:25 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE. Jury Trial set for 5/28/2019 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 5/22/2019 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon for Discovery Matters. Notice of Court Practice. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/29/2018. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 28, 2018
6 6 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 11/28 3:20 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant United American Security, LLC shall file any response to Plaintiff's Complaint (DE1 ) by December 3, 2018. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/28/2018. (kal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 27, 2018
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 11/27 12:15 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by United American Security, LLC.(Zwetsch, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, October 04, 2018
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Thu 10/04 2:40 PM
NOTICE by Carlos Muentes of Corrected Waiver of the Service of Summons (Perera, Jorge)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Thu 10/04 12:50 PM
NOTICE by Carlos Muentes of Waiver of the Service of Summons (Perera, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 27, 2018
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 09/27 2:16 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (lbc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Thu 09/27 1:34 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11030638, filed by United American Security, LLC.(Zwetsch, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - State Court File,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court