California Central District Court
Judge:Michael W Fitzgerald
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 2:18-cv-08366
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2018
Terminated:Nov 05, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2019 1:48 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Minah K. Park
Defendant
Shil K. Park
Plaintiff
Soo Oh
Represented By
Jong Yun Kim
Law Offices Of Jong Yun Kim
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, November 05, 2018
14 14 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Mon 11/05 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Soo Oh. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Kim, Jong)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 31, 2018
13 13 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 10/31 3:47 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. In light of the Notice of Settlement12 filed October 30, 2018, the Court sets a hearing on Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal for November 19, 2018 at 11:30 a.m. If a stipulated dismissal is filed prior to this date, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance is needed. All other dates and deadlines are hereby vacated. (iv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 30, 2018
12 12 notice Settlement Tue 10/30 3:16 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Soo Oh. (Kim, Jong)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 29, 2018
11 11 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 10/29 12:07 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of at least one of the following no later than November 9, 2018 as an appropriate response to this Order to Show Cause: Responses to Complaint or Applications for Stay and Early Mediation by Defendants, or applications for entry of default pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a). Failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause will result in the dismissal of this action. (iv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 18, 2018
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 10/18 2:40 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Soo Oh, upon Defendant Minah K. Park(as representative capacity as trustee of The Shil Park and Minah Park Living Trust Dated March 29, 2005) served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Elaine Park, Daughter in Law / Co-occupant. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kim, Jong)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 10/18 2:33 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Soo Oh, upon Defendant Shil K. Park(as representative capacity as trustee of The Shil Park and Minah Park Living Trust Dated March 29, 2005) served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Elaine Park, Daughter in Law / Co-occupant. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kim, Jong)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 01, 2018
8 8 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Mon 10/01 8:48 AM
NOTICE to Parties Re (ADR-20) ADA Disability Access Litigation/Application for Stay and Early Mediation: PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED to serve the ADA Packet on Defendant(s) at the same time the summons and complaint are served, if possible. If, upon receipt of this Notice to Parties, Plaintiff has already served Defendant(s), Plaintiff must serve the ADA Packet no later than fourteen (14) days after this Notice to Parties is filed by the Court. Within three (3) days of serving Defendant(s), Plaintiff must file with the Court a proof of service indicating that the ADA Packet was served on Defendant(s). *See Notice for further details.* (smom)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 28, 2018
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 09/28 4:33 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Minah K. Park(as representative capacity as trustee of The Shil Park and Minah Park Living Trust Dated March 29, 2005), Minah K. Park(as an individual), Shil K. Park(as an individual), Shil K. Park(as representative capacity as trustee of The Shil Park and Minah Park Living Trust Dated March 29, 2005). (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 09/28 4:30 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 09/28 4:29 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 27, 2018
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 09/27 4:57 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Soo Oh, (Kim, Jong)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 09/27 4:57 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Soo Oh. (Kim, Jong)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Thu 09/27 4:56 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Soo Oh. (Kim, Jong)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 09/27 4:55 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22496270 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Soo Oh. (Attorney Jong Yun Kim added to party Soo Oh(pty:pla))(Kim, Jong)
Related: [-]