City of Rochester, NH et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46106 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 27, 2018 |
Case in other court: | New Hampshire, 1:18-cv-00808 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:40 PM EST |
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC. F/K/A PAR PHARMACEUTICAL HOLDINGS, INC.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
RITE AID CORPORATION
30 HUNTER LN.
CAMP BILL, PA 17011 |
|
Defendant
RITE AID OF MARYLAND, INC. D/B/A RITE AID MID-ATLANTIC CUSTOMER SUPPORT CENTER, INC.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mylan N.V.
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC. AKA WALGREEN CO.,
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., f/k/a WATSON PHARMA, INC.
|
|
Defendant
ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC, f/k/a ACTAVIS, INC., f/k/a WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
|
|
Defendant
ALLERGAN PLC, f/k/a ACTAVIS PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Eckerd Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo International plc
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
|
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Rochester, NH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Merrimack County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:19 PM EDT |
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-808-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc) [Transferred from nhd on 9/27/2018.] | ||
1 | 1 30+ pgs NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1706053 filed by Merrimack County, Rochester, NH, City of.. Complaint includes a claim under the NH Consumer Protection Act. A copy of the Complaint has been sent to the NH Attorney General via an automatic Notice of Electronic filing. (Butterfield, Naomi) [Transferred from nhd on 9/27/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiffs for service on all parties. (mc) [Transferred from nhd on 9/27/2018.] | |
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] . (mc) [Transferred from nhd on 9/27/2018.] | ||
3 | 3 MDL - Notice of Filing, copy of the docket sheet, and a copy of the complaint sent to the MDL Panel for review. MDL Follow Up Deadline set for 11/9/2018. (mc) [Transferred from nhd on 9/27/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Docket Sheet | ||
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terence Murphy O'Rourke on behalf of Rochester, NH, City of Attorney Terence Murphy O'Rourke added to party Rochester, NH, City of(pty:pla).(O'Rourke, Terence) [Transferred from nhd on 9/27/2018.] | |
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 Summonses issued electronically as to Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo International PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached.(mc) [Transferred from nhd on 9/27/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Notice ECF, | ||
Att: 2 Assignment to Magistrate | ||
Thursday, September 27, 2018 | ||
Civil Case Terminated. (vln) [Transferred from nhd on 9/27/2018.] | ||
6 | 6 MDL FINAL ORDER. Case is transferred to Northern District of Ohio for proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407. (vln) [Transferred from nhd on 9/27/2018.] | |
7 | 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New Hampshire. Case number 1:18-cv-00808. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |