Massachusetts District Court
Judge:William G Young
Case #: 1:18-cv-12045
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2018
Terminated:Jan 02, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Mar 30, 2019 5:59 AM EDT
Defendant
Kaspersky Lab, Inc.
500 Unicorn Park
Woburn, MA 01801
Plaintiff
Greater Boston Authentication Solutions, LLC
195 Bridle Path
North Andover, MA 01845
Represented By
Paul J. Hayes
Prince Lobel Tye LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/27/2020 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, December 31, 2018
4 4 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 12/31 3:15 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Hayes, Paul)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 01, 2018
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 10/01 1:43 PM
Summons Issued as to Kaspersky Lab, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Mon 10/01 11:28 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/01 10:52 AM
COMPLAINT against Kaspersky Lab, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7344853 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Greater Boston Authentication Solutions, LLC.(Hayes, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Category Form