COPPA-KNUDSON v. FERGUSON et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-50472
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-50472
Nevada Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Bruce T Beesley |
Case #: | 3:18-ap-05015 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Oct 03, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 07, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
RAYMOND FERGUSON
310 W. WILLIAMS AVENUE
FALLON, NV 89406 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
DEEDRA FERGUSON
310 W. WILLIAMS AVENUE
FALLON, NV 89406 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JERI COPPA-KNUDSON
3495 LAKESIDE DR PMB #62
RENO, NV 89509 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, April 07, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 04/07 1:44 PM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case (cly) |
|
Tuesday, April 05, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Dismissal (case)
Tue 04/05 11:38 AM
Notice of Dismissal with Certificate of Service Filed by JEFFREY L HARTMAN on behalf of JERI COPPA-KNUDSON (HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |
|
Wednesday, March 23, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
answer
Response
Wed 03/23 3:34 PM
Response with Certificate of Service Filed by JEFFREY L HARTMAN on behalf of JERI COPPA-KNUDSON (HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |
|
Thursday, March 10, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf
Thu 03/10 9:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/10/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, March 08, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
orderad
Show Cause for Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding for Lack of Prosecution
Tue 03/08 3:00 PM
Order to Show Cause for Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding for Lack of Prosecution. Show Cause hearing to be held on 4/5/2022 at 09:30 AM at Remote. (cly) |
|
Friday, August 20, 2021 | ||
court
Order Reassigning Case
Fri 08/20 11:10 PM
|
||
Friday, October 18, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
order
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019
Fri 10/18 3:39 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 (lms) |
|
Tuesday, September 17, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
adv_misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 09/17 2:37 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by JEFFREY L HARTMAN on behalf of JERI COPPA-KNUDSON (HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Adv)
Thu 09/12 9:47 AM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Hearing scheduled 10/16/2019 at 10:00 AM at BTB RN-Courtroom 2, Young Bldg.. (cly) |
|
Wednesday, September 11, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Hearing (BK)
Wed 09/11 1:23 PM
Notice of Hearing Hearing Date: 10/16/2019 Hearing Time: 10:00 a.m. Filed by JEFFREY L HARTMAN on behalf of JERI COPPA-KNUDSON (HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019
Wed 09/11 1:20 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 and Settlement Agreement Filed by JEFFREY L HARTMAN on behalf of JERI COPPA-KNUDSON (HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |
|
Tuesday, February 19, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
court
Minute Entry Continued (BK)
Fri 02/22 5:32 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 2/19/2019. Continued. Appearance: JEFFREY L HARTMAN (Hearing scheduled 04/30/2019 at 09:00 AM at BTB RN-Courtroom 2, Young Bldg.. (ias) |
|
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 10/04 2:02 PM
Summons Service Executed on DEEDRA FERGUSON 10/4/2018 Filed by JEFFREY L HARTMAN on behalf of JERI COPPA-KNUDSON (HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |
|
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 10/04 1:57 PM
Summons Service Executed on RAYMOND FERGUSON 10/4/2018 Filed by JEFFREY L HARTMAN on behalf of JERI COPPA-KNUDSON (HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |
|
6 | 6
court
Summons Issued
Thu 10/04 11:38 AM
Summons Issued on DEEDRA FERGUSON , RAYMOND FERGUSON (lms) |
|
5 | 5
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference)
Thu 10/04 11:37 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 2/19/2019 at 09:00 AM at BTB RN-Courtroom 2, Young Bldg.. (lms) |
|
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Request to Issue Summons
Wed 10/03 10:37 AM
Request to Issue Summons On: DEEDRA FERGUSON. Filed by JEFFREY L HARTMAN on behalf of JERI COPPA-KNUDSON (HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Request to Issue Summons
Wed 10/03 10:37 AM
Request to Issue Summons On: RAYMOND FERGUSON. Filed by JEFFREY L HARTMAN on behalf of JERI COPPA-KNUDSON (HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-docket of online payment
Wed 10/03 10:34 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint 18-05015 btb) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 18464696, fee amount $ 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 10/03 10:22 AM
Adversary case 18-05015 Complaint to Avoid Transfers Filed by JERI COPPA-KNUDSON vs. RAYMOND FERGUSON, DEEDRA FERGUSON Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)(HARTMAN, JEFFREY) |