Member Case
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-12221

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin J Carey
Case #: 1:18-bk-12222
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2018
Terminated:Dec 26, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
American Tire Distributors Holdings, Inc.
12200 Herbert Wayne Court Suite 150
Huntersville, NC 28078
Represented By
Laura Davis Jones
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Last checked: Thursday Oct 04, 2018 9:02 AM EDT
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801

Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 23, 2019
10 10 1 pgs claims Claims Register Tue 04/23 10:06 PM
Claims Register Final Claims Register for Case No. 18-12222 . Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Numerical
Wednesday, December 26, 2018
9 9 order Final Decree Wed 12/26 12:09 PM
Final Decree Closing Certain of the Chapter 11 Cases Order Signed on 12/26/2018 (LMD)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 12/26 12:19 PM
Bankruptcy Case 18-12222 Closed (LMD)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 30, 2018
8 8 misc Schedules/Statements Fri 11/30 9:43 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. of American Tire Distributors Holdings, Inc. Filed by American Tire Distributors Holdings, Inc.. (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
7 7 50 pgs misc Schedules/Statements Fri 11/30 9:41 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. of American Tire Distributors Holdings, Inc. Filed by American Tire Distributors Holdings, Inc.. (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 16, 2018
6 6 motion Payment of Administrative Expenses/Claims - Motion Tue 10/16 9:37 AM
[ENTERED IN ERROR] Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses/Claims . Filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company. The case judge is Kevin J. Carey. (AJL) Modified on 10/16/2018 (AJL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, October 11, 2018
5 5 misc Withdrawal of Document - Notice Thu 10/11 2:14 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Pleadings Related [+] Filed by Bexar County. (Stecker, Don)
Related: [-] 4
Wednesday, October 10, 2018
4 4 notice Appearance - Notice Wed 10/10 1:29 PM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by Bexar County. (Stecker, Don)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 05, 2018
3 3 order Order-Joint Admin Fri 10/05 1:41 PM
Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief. An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules on Bankruptcy Procedure an Rule 1015-1 of the Local Bankruptcy Rules for the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directing joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of: ATD Corporation, Case No. 18-12221 KJC); Accelerate Holdings Corp., Case No. 18-12226 KJC); American Tire Distributors Holdings, Inc., Case No. 18-12222 KJC); American Tire Distributors, Inc., Case No. 18-12223 KJC); Rubbr Automotive Services, LLC, Case No. 18-12228 KJC); The Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, Case No. 18-12224 KJC); Terry's Tire Town Holdings, Inc., Case No. 18-12225 KJC); Tire Pros Francorp, Case No. 18-12229 KJC); and Hercules Asia Pacific, LLC, Case No. 18-12227 KJC). The docket in Case No. 18-12221 KJC) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Order Signed on 10/5/2018 (LMD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 04, 2018
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 10/04 2:08 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-12222 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9038089, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 10/04 1:09 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by American Tire Distributors Holdings, Inc.. (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Creditor Matrix
court Case Assigned Thu 10/04 6:46 AM
Judge Kevin J. Carey added to case (LCo)
Related: [-]